Automated Process Equipment Corporation v. O'Tech Corporation
Plaintiff: Automated Process Equipment Corporation
Defendant: O'Tech Corporation
Case Number: 1:2019cv00705
Filed: August 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Phillip J Green
Referring Judge: Robert J Jonker
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 17, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to complaint #1 with affirmative defenses and, COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs by O'Tech Corporation (Sullivan, Peter)
October 1, 2019 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Peter D. Sullivan on behalf of defendant O'Tech Corporation (Sullivan, Peter)
September 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER setting Rule 16 scheduling conference: Rule 16 scheduling conference is set for 11/18/2019 at 03:30 PM at 699 Federal Building, Grand Rapids, MI before Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker; status report due by 11/11/2019 ; signed by Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker (Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker, ymc)
September 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting STIPULATION #7 extending deadline to file responsive pleading ; signed by Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker (Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker, ymc)
September 26, 2019 Filing 7 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER to Extend Deadline to File Responsive Pleading by defendant O'Tech Corporation (Centner, David)
September 26, 2019 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of David W. Centner on behalf of defendant O'Tech Corporation (Centner, David)
September 6, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS returned executed; O'Tech Corporation served on 9/5/2019, answer due 9/26/2019 (Weiss, Erika)
September 3, 2019 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Todd A. Dixon on behalf of plaintiff Automated Process Equipment Corporation (Dixon, Todd)
August 30, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS ISSUED as to defendant O'Tech Corporation (ns)
August 30, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE that this case has been assigned Robert J. Jonker (ns)
August 29, 2019 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Automated Process Equipment Corporation (Weiss, Erika)
August 29, 2019 Filing 2 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued re #1 (Weiss, Erika)
August 29, 2019 FILING FEE PAID re #1 by plaintiff Automated Process Equipment Corporation in the amount of $400, receipt number AMIWDC-4523669 (Weiss, Erika)
August 29, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against O'Tech Corporation filed by Automated Process Equipment Corporation (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Weiss, Erika)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Automated Process Equipment Corporation v. O'Tech Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Automated Process Equipment Corporation
Represented By: Erika P. Weiss
Represented By: Todd A. Dixon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: O'Tech Corporation
Represented By: Peter D. Sullivan
Represented By: David W. Centner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?