Detail Technologies, LLC v. Orca Machine Tools, Inc.
Plaintiff: Detail Technologies, LLC
Defendant: Orca Machine Tools, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00710
Filed: September 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Ellen S Carmody
Referring Judge: Janet T Neff
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER setting Rule 16 scheduling conference: Rule 16 scheduling conference is set for 12/20/2019 at 10:00 AM at 401 Federal Building, Grand Rapids, MI before Judge Janet T. Neff; joint status report due by 12/13/2019; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, rmw)
October 12, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim #5 with affirmative defenses by Detail Technologies, LLC (Taylor, Timothy)
September 27, 2019 Filing 6 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by counter-claimant Orca Machine Tools, Inc., defendant Orca Machine Tools, Inc. (Rose, Steven)
September 27, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to complaint #1 with affirmative defenses and jury demand , COUNTERCLAIM against Detail Technologies, LLC by Orca Machine Tools, Inc. (Rose, Steven) Modified text on 9/30/2019 (ns).
September 10, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS returned executed; Orca Machine Tools, Inc. served on 9/6/2019, answer due 9/27/2019 (Taylor, Timothy)
September 4, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to defendant Orca Machine Tools, Inc. (ns)
September 4, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE that this case has been assigned Janet T. Neff (ns)
September 3, 2019 FILING FEE PAID re #1 by plaintiff Detail Technologies, LLC in the amount of $400, receipt number AMIWDC-4526223 (Taylor, Timothy)
September 3, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Orca Machine Tools, Inc. filed by Detail Technologies, LLC (Attachments: #1 Summons - proposed) (Taylor, Timothy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Detail Technologies, LLC v. Orca Machine Tools, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Detail Technologies, LLC
Represented By: Timothy Lee Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Orca Machine Tools, Inc.
Represented By: Steven Rose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?