Thompson v. Account Discovery Systems, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Summer Thompson
Defendant: John H. Chebat, Lawrence A. Schiavi, Jr., Luis Daniel Mendez, Diverse Funding Associates LLC, Lakeside Recovery Solution Inc., DNF Associates LLC, Account Discovery Systems, LLC, Louis L. Mendez, Levark Holdings, LLC, Louie Mendez, Damien H. Mendez, Levon D. Masich and Nicholas J. Szalkowski
Case Number: 1:2019cv00718
Filed: September 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Ellen S Carmody
Referring Judge: Janet T Neff
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 21, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL of case filed by plaintiff Summer Thompson (Rogers, Phillip)
October 12, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL re Lakeside Recovery Solution Inc., Louis L. Mendez, Damien H. Mendez and Nicholas J. Szalkowski all with prejudice filed by plaintiff Summer Thompson (Rogers, Phillip)
September 25, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL re Account Discovery Systems, LLC and John H. Chebat without prejudice filed by plaintiff Summer Thompson (Rogers, Phillip)
September 18, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS ISSUED as to defendants Levark Holdings, LLC, Levon D. Masich, Damien H. Mendez, Louis L. Mendez, Nicholas J. Szalkowski (clw)
September 18, 2019 Filing 7 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued re #6 (Rogers, Phillip)
September 17, 2019 Filing 6 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Summer Thompson (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Rogers, Phillip)
September 5, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS ISSUED as to defendants Account Discovery Systems, LLC, John H. Chebat, Lakeside Recovery Solution Inc. (clw)
September 5, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE that this case has been assigned Janet T. Neff (clw)
September 5, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL re Diverse Funding Associates LLC, DNF Associates LLC, Luis Daniel Mendez and Lawrence A. Schiavi Jr. filed by plaintiff Summer Thompson (Rogers, Phillip)
September 4, 2019 FILING FEE PAID re #1 by plaintiff Summer Thompson in the amount of $400, receipt number AMIWDC-4527265 (Rogers, Phillip)
September 4, 2019 Filing 2 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued re #1 (Rogers, Phillip)
September 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Summer Thompson (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Rogers, Phillip)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thompson v. Account Discovery Systems, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John H. Chebat
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lawrence A. Schiavi, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Luis Daniel Mendez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Diverse Funding Associates LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lakeside Recovery Solution Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DNF Associates LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Account Discovery Systems, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Louis L. Mendez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Levark Holdings, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Louie Mendez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Damien H. Mendez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Levon D. Masich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nicholas J. Szalkowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Summer Thompson
Represented By: Phillip C. Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?