State Treasurer v. Wigger
Appellee: Kevin Mark Wigger
Interested Party: Michelle M. Wilson and Office of the United States Trustee
Appellant: State Treasurer
Case Number: 1:2019cv00732
Filed: September 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Ray Kent
Referring Judge: Paul L Maloney
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 23, 2019 Copy of Bankruptcy Brief Requirement Notice #3 sent via U.S. Mail to Kevin Mark Wigger #581201 and Office of the United States Trustee (mg)
October 23, 2019 Filing 3 BRIEF REQUIREMENT NOTICE: appellant brief due by 11/22/2019 appellee brief due within 30 days after service of the brief of the appellant (mg)
October 22, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF TRANSMITTAL and RECORD ON APPEAL from Clerk, Bankruptcy Court, Western District of Michigan re Bankruptcy Appeal #1 (Attachments: #1 Record on Appeal, #2 Items 1 - 7, #3 Items 8 - 13, #4 Items 14 - 24, #5 Items 25 -29) (U.S. Bankruptcy Clerk, lmj)
September 9, 2019 Filing 1 CLERK'S NOTICE REGARDING APPEAL appeal received filed by State Treasurer (U.S. Bankruptcy Clerk, kap)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: State Treasurer v. Wigger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Kevin Mark Wigger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Michelle M. Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Office of the United States Trustee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: State Treasurer
Represented By: Katherine C. Kerwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?