Wendlandt v. JP Morgan Chase & Co.
Plaintiff: Eric Wendlandt
Defendant: JP Morgan Chase & Co.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00736
Filed: September 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Phillip J Green
Referring Judge: Paul L Maloney
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 47:227
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 25, 2019 Copy of Order on Motion for Extension of Time #10 sent via U.S. Mail to Eric Wendlandt (ems)
October 24, 2019 Filing 12 AFFIDAVIT in support of Motion for Default Judgment #11 filed by Eric Wendlandt (ems)
October 24, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for default judgment as to defendant JP Morgan Chase & Co. (with Proof of Service) by plaintiff Eric Wendlandt; (ems)
October 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #7 motion for extension of time to respond to complaint; deadline extended to 11/22/2019; signed by District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Judge Paul L. Maloney, acr)
October 23, 2019 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re MOTION for extension of time to Respond to Complaint #7 filed by JP Morgan Chase & Co. (Magyar, Mark)
October 23, 2019 Filing 8 BRIEF in support of MOTION for extension of time to Respond to Complaint #7 (with Certificate of Service) filed by JP Morgan Chase & Co. (Magyar, Mark) Modified text on 10/24/2019 (ems).
October 23, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for extension of time to Respond to Complaint by defendant JP Morgan Chase & Co.; (Magyar, Mark)
October 23, 2019 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Mark John Magyar on behalf of defendant JP Morgan Chase & Co. (Magyar, Mark)
October 23, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS returned executed by US Marshal by mail with acknowledgment of receipt of summons and complaint by JP Morgan Chase & Co. served on 9/30/2019, answer due 10/21/2019 (ems)
October 21, 2019 Filing 5 PROOF OF SERVICE by plaintiff Eric Wendlandt for service on defendant (ems)
September 10, 2019 SUMMONS ISSUED as to JP Morgan Chase & Co. and delivered to US Marshal for service (ems)
September 9, 2019 Copy of Order to Proceed In Forma Pauperis #4 sent via U.S. Mail to Eric Wendlandt (ems)
September 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting plaintiff leave to proceed in forma pauperis; signed by Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green (jkw)
September 9, 2019 Copy of Receipt of Case Notice #3 sent via U.S. Mail to Eric Wendlandt (ems)
September 9, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of receipt of case (ems)
September 6, 2019 Filing 2 APPLICATION TO PROCEED without prepayment of fees and affidavit (ems)
September 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against JP Morgan Chase & Co. filed by Eric Wendlandt (ems)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wendlandt v. JP Morgan Chase & Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JP Morgan Chase & Co.
Represented By: Mark John Magyar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Wendlandt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?