Treynor v. Knoll, Inc.
Plaintiff: Larry Craig Treynor
Defendant: Knoll North America, Inc. and Knoll, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00753
Filed: September 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Phillip J Green
Referring Judge: Robert J Jonker
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 29:621
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 31, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS returned executed; Knoll, Inc. served on 10/24/2019, answer due 11/14/2019 (Young, Jesse)
October 18, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS ISSUED as to defendant Knoll, Inc. (jlg)
October 18, 2019 Filing 6 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued re #5 (Young, Jesse)
October 18, 2019 Filing 5 First AMENDED COMPLAINT and Demand for Jury Trial against Knoll, Inc. filed by Larry Craig Treynor (Young, Jesse)
September 17, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to defendant Knoll North America, Inc. (pjw)
September 16, 2019 Filing 3 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued re #1 (Young, Jesse)
September 16, 2019 SUMMONS NOT ISSUED as to defendant Knoll North America, Inc. (none provided) (jlb)
September 16, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE that this case has been assigned Robert J. Jonker (jlb) Modified date on 9/16/2019 (jlb).
September 13, 2019 FILING FEE PAID re #1 by plaintiff Larry Craig Treynor in the amount of $400, receipt number AMIWDC-4536543 (Young, Jesse)
September 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants filed by Larry Craig Treynor (Young, Jesse)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Treynor v. Knoll, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Knoll North America, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Knoll, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry Craig Treynor
Represented By: Jesse Lee Randolph Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?