Hart Freeze Pack, LLC v. JAG Food Sales, Inc.
Plaintiff: Hart Freeze Pack, LLC
Defendant: JAG Food Sales, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00760
Filed: September 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Robert J Jonker
Referring Judge: Ray Kent
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 13, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE rescheduling hearing that was previously set for 11/14/19; Rule 16 scheduling conference is set for 12/3/2019 at 03:00 PM at 699 Federal Building, Grand Rapids, MI before Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker; (Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker, sdb)
November 8, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE rescheduling hearing that was previously set for 3:00 PM on 11/14/19; Rule 16 scheduling conference is set for 11/14/2019 at 03:30 PM at 699 Federal Building, Grand Rapids, MI before Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker; (Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker, sdb)
November 7, 2019 Filing 7 JOINT STATUS REPORT re #5 (Meuers, Lawrence) Modified text on 11/8/2019 (ns).
November 7, 2019 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Dan E. Bylenga, Jr on behalf of plaintiff Hart Freeze Pack, LLC, counter-defendant Hart Freeze Pack, LLC (Bylenga, Dan)
October 21, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to Answer to Complaint (Petition for Removal), Counterclaim #4 with affirmative defenses by Hart Freeze Pack, LLC (Bylenga, Dan)
October 16, 2019 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Lawrence H. Meuers on behalf of counter-claimant JAG Food Sales, Inc., defendant JAG Food Sales, Inc. (Meuers, Lawrence)
September 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER setting Rule 16 scheduling conference: Rule 16 scheduling conference is set for 11/14/2019 at 03:00 PM at 699 Federal Building, Grand Rapids, MI before Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker; status report due by 11/7/2019 ; signed by Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker (Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker, ymc)
September 20, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to complaint #1 with affirmative defenses , COUNTERCLAIM against Hart Freeze Pack, LLC by JAG Food Sales, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Agreement) (Nurenberg, Steven)
September 17, 2019 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by JAG Food Sales, Inc. (Nurenberg, Steven)
September 17, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE that this case has been assigned Robert J. Jonker ; with NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY re corporate disclosure statement (ns)
September 16, 2019 FILING FEE PAID re #1 by defendant JAG Food Sales, Inc. in the amount of $400, receipt number AMIWDC-4538388 (Nurenberg, Steven)
September 16, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Oceana County Circuit Court case number 19-13678-CK filed by JAG Food Sales, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Summons and Complaint from State Court-Oceana County, Michigan) (Nurenberg, Steven)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hart Freeze Pack, LLC v. JAG Food Sales, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hart Freeze Pack, LLC
Represented By: Mark A. Pehrson
Represented By: Dan E. Bylenga, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JAG Food Sales, Inc.
Represented By: Steven Elwyn Nurenberg
Represented By: Lawrence H. Meuers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?