BMO Harris Bank N.A. v. Brown
Plaintiff: BMO Harris Bank N.A.
Defendant: David Brown
Case Number: 1:2019cv00773
Filed: September 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Phillip J Green
Referring Judge: Paul L Maloney
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 4, 2019 Filing 9 DEFAULT JUDGMENT in favor of plaintiff against defendant; signed by District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Judge Paul L. Maloney, acr)
October 31, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for default judgment as to David Brown by plaintiff BMO Harris Bank N.A.; (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of James K. Haney in Support of Motion for Default Judgment, #2 Exhibit A - Affidavit of Debb White in Support of Motion for Default Judgment, #3 Certificate of Service, #4 Proposed Order) (Haney, James)
October 21, 2019 Filing 7 DEFAULT ENTERED as to defendant David Brown (clw)
October 17, 2019 Filing 6 APPLICATION for entry of default as to David Brown (Attachments: #1 Affidavit for Entry of Default, #2 Non-Military Affidavit, #3 Proposed Order) (Haney, James)
October 9, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS returned executed; David Brown served on 9/25/2019, answer due 10/16/2019 (Haney, James)
September 23, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to defendant David Brown (clw)
September 23, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE that this case has been assigned Paul L. Maloney (clw)
September 20, 2019 FILING FEE PAID re #1 by plaintiff BMO Harris Bank N.A. in the amount of $400, receipt number AMIWDC-4543705 (Haney, James)
September 20, 2019 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by BMO Harris Bank N.A. identifying Corporate Parent BMO Financial Group for BMO Harris Bank N.A. (Haney, James)
September 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against David Brown filed by BMO Harris Bank N.A. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Summons) (Haney, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BMO Harris Bank N.A. v. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BMO Harris Bank N.A.
Represented By: James Kevin Haney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?