Accident Fund Insurance Company of America v. Bilinski
Plaintiff: Accident Fund Insurance Company of America
Defendant: Craig Bilinski
Case Number: 1:2019cv00778
Filed: September 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Robert J Jonker
Referring Judge: Ray Kent
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 14, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE rescheduling hearing that was previously set for 11/22/19; Rule 16 scheduling conference is set for 1/17/2020 at 03:00 PM at 699 Federal Building, Grand Rapids, MI before Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker; (Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker, sdb)
November 14, 2019 Filing 13 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER Joint Stipulation and Request to Extend Time for Rule 16 Scheduling Conference and Joint Status Report [Proposed Order] by plaintiff Accident Fund Insurance Company of America [Attorney Brooks Todd Westergard added to party Accident Fund Insurance Company of America(pty:pla)] (Westergard, Brooks) Modified text on 11/15/2019 (clw).
October 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER setting Rule 16 scheduling conference: Rule 16 scheduling conference is set for 11/22/2019 at 03:00 PM at 699 Federal Building, Grand Rapids, MI before Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker; status report due by 11/15/2019 ; signed by Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker (Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker, ymc)
October 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting STIPULATION #10 ; signed by Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker (Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker, sdb)
October 4, 2019 Filing 10 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER re Preliminary Injunction by plaintiff Accident Fund Insurance Company of America (Doyle, Peter)
October 1, 2019 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Patrick Daniel Crandell on behalf of defendant Craig Bilinski (Crandell, Patrick)
October 1, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS returned executed; Craig Bilinski served 9/29/2019, answer due 10/21/2019 (Doyle, Peter) Modified text on 10/2/2019 (clw).
September 27, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS ISSUED as to defendant Craig Bilinski (clw)
September 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER denying #2 Plaintiff's Ex Parte Motion for TRO to the extent it seeks ex parte relief. Defendant to file response to Plaintiff's motion not later than 7 calendar days from the date the motion papers are served on him ; signed by Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker (Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker, ymc)
September 26, 2019 Filing 6 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued re #1 (Doyle, Peter)
September 26, 2019 SUMMONS NOT ISSUED as to defendant Craig Bilinski (none provided) (clw)
September 26, 2019 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Peter Edward Doyle on behalf of plaintiff Accident Fund Insurance Company of America (Doyle, Peter)
September 26, 2019 FILING FEE PAID re #1 by plaintiff Accident Fund Insurance Company of America in the amount of $400, receipt number AMIWDC-4549943 (Artz, John)
September 26, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE that this case has been assigned Robert J. Jonker ; with NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY re filing fee (clw)
September 25, 2019 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Accident Fund Insurance Company of America (Artz, John)
September 25, 2019 Filing 3 EX PARTE DOCUMENT filed by plaintiff Accident Fund Insurance Company of America re EX PARTE MOTION for TRO by plaintiff Accident Fund Insurance Company of America #2 Brief in Support of Motion for TRO (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4) (Artz, John)
September 25, 2019 Filing 2 EX PARTE MOTION for TRO by plaintiff Accident Fund Insurance Company of America (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Artz, John)
September 25, 2019 FILING FEE PAID re #1 by plaintiff Accident Fund Insurance Company of America in the amount of $47, receipt number AMIWDC-4549128 (Artz, John)
September 25, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Craig Bilinski filed by Accident Fund Insurance Company of America (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Artz, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Accident Fund Insurance Company of America v. Bilinski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Craig Bilinski
Represented By: Patrick Daniel Crandell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Accident Fund Insurance Company of America
Represented By: John Shepherd Artz
Represented By: Brooks Todd Westergard
Represented By: Peter Edward Doyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?