Mister E-Liquid LLC v. Whitmer et al
Plaintiff: Mister E-Liquid LLC
Defendant: Gretchen Whitmer and Robert Gordon
Case Number: 1:2019cv00786
Filed: September 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Robert J Jonker
Referring Judge: Ray Kent
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 29, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL of case filed by plaintiff Mister E-Liquid LLC (Blair, Kevin)
October 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER rejecting STIPULATION #18 ; signed by Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker (Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker, ymc)
October 21, 2019 Filing 19 PROOF OF SERVICE by defendants Robert Gordon, Gretchen Whitmer re PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER to Hold Case In Abeyance by defendants Robert Gordon, Gretchen Whitmer #18 (Potchen, Joseph)
October 21, 2019 Filing 18 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER to Hold Case In Abeyance by defendants Robert Gordon, Gretchen Whitmer (Potchen, Joseph)
October 15, 2019 Filing 17 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by defendants Robert Gordon, Gretchen Whitmer re Response in Opposition, #16 (Potchen, Joseph)
October 15, 2019 Filing 16 RESPONSE in opposition to EMERGENCY MOTION for temporary restraining order #3 (Defendant's Brief in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction) filed by Robert Gordon, Gretchen Whitmer (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E) (Potchen, Joseph) Modified text and link on 10/16/2019 (ems).
October 15, 2019 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Joseph E. Potchen on behalf of defendants Robert Gordon, Gretchen Whitmer (Potchen, Joseph)
October 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #13 motion for leave to file; signed by Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker (Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker, sdb)
October 3, 2019 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re MOTION for leave to file Reply Brief in Support of Its Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction #13 filed by Mister E-Liquid LLC (Blair, Kevin)
October 3, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for leave to file Reply Brief in Support of Its Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction by plaintiff Mister E-Liquid LLC; (Blair, Kevin)
October 2, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS returned executed; All Defendants served on 10/1/2019, answer due 10/22/2019 (Blair, Kevin) Modified text on 10/2/2019 (ems).
October 1, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS ISSUED as to defendant Gretchen Whitmer (clw)
October 1, 2019 Filing 10 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued re #1 (Blair, Kevin)
September 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER denying #3 motion for TRO ; signed by Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker (Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker, ymc)
September 30, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS ISSUED as to defendants Robert Gordon, Gretchen Whitmer (mg)
September 27, 2019 RECEIPT: in the amount of $400.00 by Attorney Kevin McArdle Blair on behalf of plaintiff, receipt number AMIWDC-4551638; for filing fee (mkc)
September 27, 2019 Filing 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Mister E-Liquid LLC (Blair, Kevin)
September 27, 2019 SUMMONS NOT ISSUED as to defendants Robert Gordon, Gretchen Whitmer (filing fee not paid) (ems)
September 27, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE that this case has been assigned Robert J. Jonker ; with NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY re filing fee re corporate disclosure statement (ems)
September 27, 2019 Filing 5 BRIEF in support of EMERGENCY MOTION for temporary restraining order #3 filed by Mister E-Liquid LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit D-1) (Blair, Kevin)
September 27, 2019 Filing 4 (DISREGARD) NOTICE that this case has been assigned Robert J. Jonker (mbb) Modified text on 9/27/2019 (ems).
September 27, 2019 Filing 3 EMERGENCY MOTION for temporary restraining order by plaintiff Mister E-Liquid LLC; (Blair, Kevin)
September 27, 2019 Filing 2 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued re #1 (Blair, Kevin)
September 27, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Mister E-Liquid LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit D-1) (Blair, Kevin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mister E-Liquid LLC v. Whitmer et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gretchen Whitmer
Represented By: Joseph E. Potchen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Gordon
Represented By: Joseph E. Potchen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mister E-Liquid LLC
Represented By: Kevin McArdle Blair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?