Weaver v. Safeco Insurance Company of America
Plaintiff: Timothy Weaver
Defendant: Safeco Insurance Company of America
Case Number: 1:2019cv00821
Filed: October 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Sally J Berens
Referring Judge: Janet T Neff
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER setting Rule 16 scheduling conference: Rule 16 scheduling conference is set for 12/23/2019 at 01:30 PM at 401 Federal Building, Grand Rapids, MI before Judge Janet T. Neff; joint status report due by 12/16/2019; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, rmw)
November 22, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to complaint #1 with affirmative defenses and/or Avoidance Defenses by Safeco Insurance Company of America (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Safeco Policy) (Brown, Stephen)
November 2, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE that this case is reassigned to Sally J. Berens under #Administrative Order No. 19-CA-093, Magistrate Judge Ellen S. Carmody is no longer assigned to the case (sjc)
October 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting STIPULATION #6 ; Defendant has until and including 11/22/2019 to file its answer to Plaintiff's Complaint; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, rmw)
October 25, 2019 Filing 6 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER to Answer Plaintiff's Complaint by defendant Safeco Insurance Company of America [Attorney Stephen P. Brown added to party Safeco Insurance Company of America(pty:dft)] (Brown, Stephen)
October 23, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS returned executed; Safeco Insurance Company of America served on 10/18/2019, answer due 11/8/2019 (Aiello, Frank)
October 10, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to defendant Safeco Insurance Company of America (ems)
October 10, 2019 Filing 3 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued re #1 (Aiello, Frank)
October 10, 2019 SUMMONS NOT ISSUED as to defendant Safeco Insurance Company of America (none provided) (ems)
October 10, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE that this case has been assigned Janet T. Neff (ems)
October 9, 2019 FILING FEE PAID re #1 by plaintiff Timothy Weaver in the amount of $400, receipt number AMIWDC-4561540 (Aiello, Frank)
October 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against Safeco Insurance Company of America filed by Timothy Weaver (Aiello, Frank)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Weaver v. Safeco Insurance Company of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Safeco Insurance Company of America
Represented By: Stephen P. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy Weaver
Represented By: Frank T. Aiello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?