Rettelle v. Michigan, State of et al
Plaintiff: Justina Rettelle
Defendant: Gretchen Whitmer, Michigan, State of, Lansing Police Department and Michigan Department of Attorney General
Case Number: 1:2019cv00858
Filed: October 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Phillip J Green
Referring Judge: Paul L Maloney
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 3, 2019 Certified Copy of Judgment #8 , Order Regarding Report and Recommendation #7 sent via U.S. Mail to Justina Rettelle (clw)
December 2, 2019 Filing 8 JUDGMENT; signed by District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Judge Paul L. Maloney, cmc)
December 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION #5 ; signed by District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Judge Paul L. Maloney, cmc)
November 5, 2019 Filing 6 OBJECTION by plaintiff Justina Rettelle to Report and Recommendation #5 (clw)
October 25, 2019 Copy of Report and Recommendation #5 sent via U.S. Mail to Justina Rettelle (clw)
October 25, 2019 Filing 5 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #1 ; objections to R&R due within 14 days; signed by Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green (jkw)
October 22, 2019 Copy of Order to Proceed In Forma Pauperis #4 sent via U.S. Mail to Justina Rettelle (clw)
October 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting plaintiff leave to proceed in forma pauperis; signed by Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green (jkw)
October 21, 2019 Copy of Receipt of Case Notice #3 sent via U.S. Mail to Justina Rettelle (jlb)
October 21, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of receipt of case (jlb)
October 18, 2019 Filing 2 APPLICATION TO PROCEED without prepayment of fees and affidavit (jlb)
October 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against Lansing Police Department, Michigan Department of Attorney General, Michigan, State of, Gretchen Whitmer filed by Justina Rettelle (jlb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rettelle v. Michigan, State of et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gretchen Whitmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michigan, State of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lansing Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michigan Department of Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Justina Rettelle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?