Goodwin v. Flagstar Bank et al
Plaintiff: Keith A. Goodwin
Defendant: Flagstar Bank and Steven Smith
Case Number: 1:2019cv00859
Filed: October 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Phillip J Green
Referring Judge: Paul L Maloney
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 24, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS returned executed; Flagstar Bank served on 10/24/2019, answer due 11/14/2019 (mg)
October 24, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS returned executed; Steven Smith served on 10/24/2019, answer due 11/14/2019 (mg)
October 24, 2019 SUMMONS ISSUED as to defendants Flagstar Bank, Steven Smith and returned to plaintiff at counter in Grand Rapids (jlb) Modified text on 10/24/2019 (jlb).
October 23, 2019 Copy of Receipt of Case Notice #3 sent via U.S. Mail to Keith A. Goodwin (mg)
October 22, 2019 SUMMONS NOT ISSUED as to defendants Flagstar Bank, Steven Smith (none provided) (mg)
October 22, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of receipt of case (mg)
October 18, 2019 RECEIPT: in the amount of $400, receipt number GR068223; for Filing fee (mg)
October 18, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for order titled as "Motion and Judicial Notice to enforce the bank's new accepted Credit Agreement Contract and request/require/demand: a court of record common law speedy trial by jury inviolate for fraud and want of jurisdiction" by plaintiff Keith A. Goodwin; (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1) (mg)
October 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand titled as "Common law court of record tort claim petition and request for a speedy trial by jury inviolate" against Flagstar Bank, Steven Smith filed by Keith A. Goodwin (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I) (mg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Goodwin v. Flagstar Bank et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Flagstar Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keith A. Goodwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?