Martuch v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: John David Martuch
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Interested Party: Social Security Administration
Case Number: 1:2019cv00876
Filed: October 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Phillip J Green
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Title XVI
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 18, 2019 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Sophie Marie Doroba on behalf of defendant Commissioner of Social Security (Doroba, Sophie)
November 13, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS returned executed on Commissioner of Social Security, US Attorney and US Attorney General; service upon defendant, Commissioner of Social Security complete on 11/1/2019, answer due 12/31/2019 (Bailey, Wendy)
October 23, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to defendant Commissioner of Social Security, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (ems)
October 23, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE that this case has been assigned Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green (ems)
October 23, 2019 FILING FEE PAID re #1 by plaintiff John David Martuch in the amount of $400, receipt number AMIWDC-4572876 (Bailey, Wendy)
October 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security filed by John David Martuch (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Summons) (Bailey, Wendy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Martuch v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John David Martuch
Represented By: Wendy Kay Bailey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Sophie Marie Doroba
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?