Bunker v. C.R. Bard, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Andrea Bunker
Defendant: C.R. Bard, Inc. and Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00890
Filed: October 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Ray Kent
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 25, 2019 Filing 8 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from Arizona, their case number 2:16-cv-01257; the documents listed above were electronically transferred to the Western District of Michigan (ndj)
October 24, 2019 Remark: Transferring Case to the Western District of Michigan via electronic transfer. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 10/25/2019.]
October 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER. (Second) See Order for Complete Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 10/17/19. (MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 10/25/2019.]
September 12, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #5 Notice of Appearance/Association of Counsel filed by Andrea Bunker. Document entered in wrong case. All documents are to be filed in the lead case only. FOLLOW-UP ACTION REQUIRED: Please refile document in correct case if you have not already done so. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (SLQ) [Transferred from Arizona on 10/25/2019.]
September 12, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by C Lincoln Combs on behalf of Andrea Bunker. (Combs, C) [Transferred from Arizona on 10/25/2019.]
April 28, 2016 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(LSP). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document. [Transferred from Arizona on 10/25/2019.]
April 28, 2016 Filing 3 SUMMONS Submitted by Andrea Bunker. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(LSP) [Transferred from Arizona on 10/25/2019.]
April 28, 2016 Filing 2 This case has been assigned to the Honorable David G. Campbell, with member case number: CV-16-1257-PHX-DGC. This case is included in MDL-2641. All future pleadings or documents should be filed in the Lead Case: 2:15-md-2641-DGC. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 10/25/2019.]
April 28, 2016 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-12904598 filed by Andrea Bunker. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 10/25/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bunker v. C.R. Bard, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C.R. Bard, Inc.
Represented By: Richard B North, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc.
Represented By: Richard B North, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrea Bunker
Represented By: Yvonne M. Flaherty
Represented By: C Lincoln Combs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?