Maturen v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Brian Maturen
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Interested Party: Social Security Administration
Case Number: 1:2019cv00910
Filed: October 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Sally J Berens
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Title XVI
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 17, 2019 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Eleanor Anne Dorothy on behalf of defendant Commissioner of Social Security (Dorothy, Eleanor)
December 10, 2019 Filing 6 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security served on 11/6/2019, answer due 1/6/2020 (ns)
November 2, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE that this case is reassigned to Sally J. Berens under #Administrative Order No. 19-CA-093, Magistrate Judge Ellen S. Carmody is no longer assigned to the case (krv)
October 31, 2019 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Commissioner of Social Security, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General and delivered to US Marshal for service (ns)
October 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting plaintiff leave to proceed in forma pauperis; signed by Magistrate Judge Ellen S. Carmody (jal)
October 29, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE that this case has been assigned Magistrate Judge Ellen S. Carmody (ns)
October 29, 2019 Filing 2 APPLICATION TO PROCEED without prepayment of fees and affidavit (O'Rourke, Timothy)
October 29, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security filed by Brian Maturen (O'Rourke, Timothy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Maturen v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Eleanor Anne Dorothy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Maturen
Represented By: Timothy A. O'Rourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?