Morrow v. Equifax Information Services, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Brian V. Morrow
Defendant: Equifax Information Services, LLC and Trans Union LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv00930
Filed: November 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Phillip J Green
Referring Judge: Paul L Maloney
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 STIPULATION AND ORDER; deadline for defendant Equifax Information Services, LLC to respond to complaint extended to 1/8/2020; signed by District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Judge Paul L. Maloney, acr)
December 9, 2019 Filing 10 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER of Extension of Time to File Answer by defendant Equifax Information Services, LLC (Bolton, Jordan)
December 9, 2019 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Jordan S. Bolton on behalf of defendant Equifax Information Services, LLC (Bolton, Jordan)
December 6, 2019 Filing 9 PROOF OF SERVICE by defendant Trans Union LLC re Answer to Complaint #8 And Affirmative Defenses (Jansen, Sandra)
December 6, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to complaint #1 with affirmative defenses by Trans Union LLC (Jansen, Sandra) Modified text on 12/9/2019 (ns).
December 3, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS returned executed; Equifax Information Services, LLC served on 11/18/2019, answer due 12/9/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit) (Reyna, Nicholas)
December 3, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS returned executed; Trans Union LLC served on 11/18/2019, answer due 12/9/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit) (Reyna, Nicholas)
November 25, 2019 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Trans Union LLC identifying Corporate Parent TransUnion, Corporate Parent TransUnion Intermediate Holdings, Inc., Other Affiliate T. Rowe Price Group, Inc. for Trans Union LLC (Jansen, Sandra)
November 25, 2019 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Sandra Davis Jansen on behalf of defendant Trans Union LLC (Jansen, Sandra)
November 5, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to defendants Equifax Information Services, LLC, Trans Union LLC (ns)
November 5, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE that this case has been assigned Paul L. Maloney (ns)
November 5, 2019 Filing 2 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued re #1 (Reyna, Nicholas)
November 5, 2019 FILING FEE PAID re #1 by plaintiff Brian V. Morrow in the amount of $400, receipt number AMIWDC-4587073 (Reyna, Nicholas)
November 5, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against Equifax Information Services, LLC, Trans Union LLC filed by Brian V. Morrow (Reyna, Nicholas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Morrow v. Equifax Information Services, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Information Services, LLC
Represented By: Jordan S. Bolton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trans Union LLC
Represented By: Sandra Davis Jansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian V. Morrow
Represented By: Nicholas Allan Reyna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?