Heykoop v. Oceana, County of, et al
Plaintiff: John Heykoop
Defendant: Oceana, County of, Mason-Oceana 911 Board, Craig Mast and Ray Hasil
Case Number: 1:2019cv00938
Filed: November 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Sally J Berens
Referring Judge: Robert J Jonker
2 Judge: Paul L Maloney
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER setting Rule 16 scheduling conference: Rule 16 scheduling conference is set for 1/17/2020 at 04:00 PM at 699 Federal Building, Grand Rapids, MI before Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker; status report due by 1/10/2020 ; signed by Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker (Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker, ymc)
November 18, 2019 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Michael Naughton on behalf of plaintiff John Heykoop (Naughton, Michael)
November 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER No. 19-CA-103 that this case is reassigned to Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker for all further proceedings; signed by Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker (ems)
November 14, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to complaint #1 Affirmative Defenses, and Reliance Upon Jury Demand by Ray Hasil, Mason-Oceana 911 Board (Vander Laan, Allan)
November 13, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to complaint #1 with affirmative defenses and jury demand by Craig Mast, Oceana, County of (Brege, Andrew)
November 12, 2019 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Bradley Charles Yanalunas on behalf of defendants Ray Hasil, Mason-Oceana 911 Board (Yanalunas, Bradley)
November 12, 2019 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Allan C. Vander Laan on behalf of defendants Ray Hasil, Mason-Oceana 911 Board (Vander Laan, Allan)
November 7, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE that this case has been assigned Paul L. Maloney (clw)
November 6, 2019 Filing 2 PROOF OF SERVICE by defendants Craig Mast, Oceana County re Notice of Removal #1 (Brege, Andrew)
November 6, 2019 FILING FEE PAID re #1 by defendants Craig Mast, Oceana County in the amount of $400, receipt number AMIWDC-4589015 (Brege, Andrew)
November 6, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Oceana County Circuit Court case number 19-13831-NZ filed by Craig Mast, Oceana County (Attachments: #1 State Court Summons & Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Brege, Andrew) Modified text on 11/7/2019 (clw).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Heykoop v. Oceana, County of, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oceana, County of
Represented By: Andrew James Brege
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mason-Oceana 911 Board
Represented By: Allan C. Vander Laan
Represented By: Bradley Charles Yanalunas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Craig Mast
Represented By: Andrew James Brege
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ray Hasil
Represented By: Allan C. Vander Laan
Represented By: Bradley Charles Yanalunas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Heykoop
Represented By: Michael Corcoran
Represented By: Michael Naughton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?