Harris #476889 v. Kitchka et al
Plaintiff: Larry Devonte Harris #476889
Defendant: Christopher Becker, Erin Kitchka, William G. Kelly, Alex Grimes and Travis Early
Case Number: 1:2019cv00954
Filed: November 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Robert J Jonker
Referring Judge: Ray Kent
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 2, 2020 Certified Copy of Opinion (Screening) #4 , Judgment - Frivolous, Malicious, or for Failure to State a Claim (Prisoner Civil Rights Case) #5 sent via U.S. Mail to Larry Devonte Harris #476889 (clw)
December 31, 2019 Filing 5 JUDGMENT that the action is dismissed for failure to state a claim ; signed by Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker (Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker, ymc)
December 31, 2019 Filing 4 OPINION ; signed by Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker (Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker, ymc)
December 13, 2019 RECEIPT (Prisoner Litigation): initial filing fee installment in the amount of $1.67, receipt number GR068986; amount paid to date $1.67 (mkc)
November 14, 2019 Copy of Order to Proceed IFP - Initial Fee Due in 28 Days - Prisoner #3 sent via U.S. Mail to Larry Devonte Harris #476889 (clw)
November 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS and FOR PAYMENT OF FILING FEE: plaintiff to pay an initial partial fee of $1.67 within 28 days; plaintiff to make interim payments until the full fee is paid; (initial partial filing fee to be submitted by 12/12/2019); signed by Magistrate Judge Ray Kent (fhw)
November 12, 2019 Filing 2 APPLICATION TO PROCEED without prepayment of fees and affidavit (Attachments: #1 Financial Documents) (clw)
November 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with magistrate referral against Christopher Becker, Travis Early, Alex Grimes, William G. Kelly, Erin Kitchka filed by Larry Devonte Harris #476889 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-G) (clw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harris #476889 v. Kitchka et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Becker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Erin Kitchka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William G. Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alex Grimes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travis Early
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry Devonte Harris #476889
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?