Modena v. U.S. Bank National Association et al
Plaintiff: Michael J. Modena
Defendant: Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc. and U.S. Bank National Association
Case Number: 1:2019cv00974
Filed: November 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Ray Kent
Referring Judge: Paul L Maloney
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 13, 2020 Filing 18 REPLY to response to motion #13 to Dismiss filed by Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc., U.S. Bank National Association (Williams, Dawn)
December 30, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION to strike #13 by plaintiff Michael J. Modena; (ns)
December 27, 2019 Filing 16 LETTER RETURNING DISCOVERY MATERIAL: First Request for Production of Documents returned to Michael J. Modena (clw)
December 23, 2019 Filing 14 BRIEF in support of MOTION to dismiss #13 filed by Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc., U.S. Bank National Association (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Williams, Dawn)
December 23, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION to dismiss by defendants Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc., U.S. Bank National Association; (Williams, Dawn)
December 20, 2019 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by plaintiff Michael J. Modena for request for production of documents (clw)
December 16, 2019 Filing 12 REPLY to response to motion #10 with certificate of service filed by Michael J. Modena (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1) (clw)
December 6, 2019 Filing 11 RESPONSE in opposition to MOTION to remand case back to state Court #10 filed by Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc., U.S. Bank National Association (Williams, Dawn)
November 25, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to remand case back to state Court by plaintiff Michael J. Modena; (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1) (clw)
November 20, 2019 Copy of Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply #9 sent via U.S. Mail to Michael J. Modena (clw)
November 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #6 motion for extension of time to file response/reply to 12/23/2019; signed by District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Judge Paul L. Maloney, cmc)
November 18, 2019 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Laura C. Baucus on behalf of defendants Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc., U.S. Bank National Association (Baucus, Laura)
November 18, 2019 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re MOTION for extension of time to file response/reply re #1 #6 filed by Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc., U.S. Bank National Association (Williams, Dawn)
November 18, 2019 Filing 7 BRIEF in support of MOTION for extension of time to file response/reply re #1 #6 filed by Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc., U.S. Bank National Association (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Williams, Dawn)
November 18, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for extension of time to file response/reply re #1 by defendants Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc., U.S. Bank National Association; (Williams, Dawn)
November 18, 2019 Copy of Notice Regarding Assignment of Case #5 sent via U.S. Mail to Michael J. Modena 109 Barry Street, SE, #3 Grand Rapids MI 49548 (clw)
November 18, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE that this case has been assigned Paul L. Maloney (clw)
November 15, 2019 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by U.S. Bank National Association (Williams, Dawn)
November 15, 2019 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc. (Williams, Dawn)
November 15, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF FILING notice of removal re #1 directed to Michael J. Modena and Clerk of Oceana County Circuit Court by defendants Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc., U.S. Bank National Association (Williams, Dawn)
November 15, 2019 FILING FEE PAID re #1 by defendants Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc., U.S. Bank National Association in the amount of $400, receipt number AMIWDC-4621879 (Williams, Dawn)
November 15, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Oceana County Circuit Court case number 19-13845-CZ filed by Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc., U.S. Bank National Association (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Williams, Dawn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Modena v. U.S. Bank National Association et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc.
Represented By: Dawn Nicole Williams
Represented By: Laura C. Baucus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Bank National Association
Represented By: Dawn Nicole Williams
Represented By: Laura C. Baucus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael J. Modena
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?