Fletcher v. Fitz et al
Plaintiff: Travis Fletcher
Defendant: Cass County Prosecuting Office and Victor A. Fitz
Case Number: 1:2019cv00980
Filed: November 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Robert J Jonker
Referring Judge: Ray Kent
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 23, 2019 Copy of Order to File Amended Pleading on the Form #5 and complaint under42 U.S.C. 1983 for a civil action by a person in state custody form sent via U.S. Mail to Travis Fletcher (clw)
December 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER directing the filing party to submit an amended pleading in proper form within 28 days or the action may be dismissed; signed by Magistrate Judge Ray Kent (fhw)
December 13, 2019 Copy of Order to Proceed IFP - Without Payment of Initial Fee - Prisoner, #4 sent via U.S. Mail to Travis Fletcher (ns)
December 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS and FOR PAYMENT OF FILING FEE: plaintiff may proceed in forma pauperis without payment of an initial partial filing fee; plaintiff to remain liable for the filing fee as funds become available; signed by Magistrate Judge Ray Kent (fhw)
December 2, 2019 Filing 3 APPLICATION TO PROCEED without prepayment of fees and affidavit (Attachments: #1 Financial Documents, #2 Letter) (ns)
November 19, 2019 Copy of Deficiency Order #2 sent via U.S. Mail to Travis Fletcher (ns)
November 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 DEFICIENCY ORDER: plaintiff has failed to pay the filing fee or file the required documents to apply to proceed in forma pauperis; deficiency to be cured by 12/17/2019 or the action will be dismissed; signed by Magistrate Judge Ray Kent (fhw)
November 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with magistrate referral against Cass County Prosecuting Office, Victor A. Fitz filed by Travis Fletcher (ns)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fletcher v. Fitz et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Travis Fletcher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cass County Prosecuting Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Victor A. Fitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?