Smith #267009 v. Burk et al
Plaintiff: Derrick Lee Smith #267009
Defendant: G. Scanlon, M. Burk, S. L. Burt, Richard Russell, Heidi Washington and Unknown Dixon-Ingalls
Case Number: 1:2019cv01018
Filed: December 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Phillip J Green
Referring Judge: Paul L Maloney
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 9, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MOTION for leave to file recently obtained documents by plaintiff Derrick Lee Smith #267009; (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (clw)
January 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 LETTER from plaintiff Derrick Lee Smith #267009 requesting docket sheet; copy of docket sheet mailed on 1/3/2020 (clw)
December 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 WITNESS LIST by plaintiff Derrick Lee Smith #267009 (jlg)
December 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Derrick Lee Smith #267009 (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1) (jlg)
December 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Copy of Order to File Amended Pleading on the Form #3 and Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint Form under 42 U.S.C. 1983 sent via U.S. Mail to Derrick Lee Smith #267009 (clw)
December 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 LETTER from Derrick Lee Smith #267009 requesting the Court to provide him with the correct prisoner civil rights complaint form; Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint Form under 42 U.S.C. 1983 mailed to Derrick Lee Smith #267009 on 12/16/2019 (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1 - Cover Letter) (clw)
December 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER directing the filing party to submit an amended pleading in proper form within 28 days or the action may be dismissed; signed by Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green (jkw)
December 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 LETTER from plaintiff Derrick Lee Smith #267009 regarding status of case; mailed copy of docket sheet on 12/12/2019 (clw)
December 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT with magistrate referral against M. Burk, S. L. Burt, Richard Russell, G. Scanlon, Heidi Washington filed by Derrick Lee Smith #267009 (clw)
December 4, 2019 Opinion or Order RECEIPT: in the amount of $400.00, receipt number GR068841; for Filing Fee (clw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith #267009 v. Burk et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Derrick Lee Smith #267009
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G. Scanlon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Burk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S. L. Burt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Russell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Heidi Washington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Dixon-Ingalls
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?