Forbes v. Flagstar Bank, FSB et al
Plaintiff: Tyler J. Forbes
Defendant: Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC, Flagstar Bank, FSB, Green Tree Servicing, LLC and Schneiderman & Sherman, P.C.
Case Number: 1:2019cv01031
Filed: December 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Sally J Berens
Referring Judge: Robert J Jonker
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1444
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 31, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 31, 2020 Filing 30 BRIEF in support of MOTION to stay Proceedings as to Defendant Green Tree Servicing LLC, only, #29 filed by Green Tree Servicing, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Bankruptcy Court Order, #2 Exhibit B- Excerpt from Chapter 11 Plan, #3 Index) (Krause, Courtney)
January 31, 2020 Filing 29 MOTION to stay Proceedings as to Defendant Green Tree Servicing LLC, only, by defendant Green Tree Servicing, LLC; (Krause, Courtney)
January 13, 2020 Filing 28 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by defendant Schneiderman & Sherman, P.C. re Answer to Complaint #27 (Jacobs, Steven)
January 13, 2020 Filing 27 CORRECTED ANSWER to complaint with affirmative defenses (corrected to comply with Local Civil Rule 10.1) by Schneiderman & Sherman, P.C. (Jacobs, Steven) Modified text on 1/13/2020; this entry replaces #22 (ems).
January 13, 2020 Filing 26 NOTICE to attorney Steven A. Jacobs regarding recent filing #22 (ems)
January 10, 2020 Filing 25 PROOF OF SERVICE by defendant Green Tree Servicing, LLC re MOTION to dismiss for failure to state a claim #23 , Brief in Support of a Motion, #24 (Krause, Courtney)
January 10, 2020 Filing 24 BRIEF in support of MOTION to dismiss for failure to state a claim #23 filed by Green Tree Servicing, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Recorded Mortgage, #2 Exhibit B- AOM Mers to Flagstar, #3 Exhibit C- AOM Flagstar to Green Tree, #4 Exhibit D- 2014 Loan Mod, #5 Exhibit E- 2015 Loan Mod, #6 Exhibit F- Brackens v MERS, #7 Exhibit G- Green Tree Licensing, #8 Exhibit H- Davis v GMAC, #9 Index of Exhibits) (Krause, Courtney)
January 10, 2020 Filing 23 MOTION to dismiss for failure to state a claim by defendant Green Tree Servicing, LLC; (Krause, Courtney)
January 10, 2020 Filing 22 ANSWER to complaint with affirmative defenses and certificate of service by Schneiderman & Sherman, P.C. (Jacobs, Steven)
January 10, 2020 Filing 21 PROOF OF SERVICE by defendant Flagstar Bank, FSB re Answer to Complaint (Petition for Removal) #19 , Affirmative Defenses #20 (Santi, Paul)
January 10, 2020 Filing 20 AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES by defendant Flagstar Bank, FSB re #19 (Santi, Paul)
January 10, 2020 Filing 19 ANSWER to complaint #1 by Flagstar Bank, FSB (Santi, Paul)
January 9, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE OF BANKRUPTCY upon the record as to Green Tree Servicing LLC, now known as Ditech Financial LLC by defendant Green Tree Servicing, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Plan Injunction) (Krause, Courtney)
January 9, 2020 Filing 17 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Green Tree Servicing, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Ditech Holding Corporation for Green Tree Servicing, LLC (Krause, Courtney)
January 6, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL re Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC filed by plaintiff Tyler J. Forbes (Cotner, Roger)
December 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting PROPOSED ORDER #13 for extension of time to file responsive pleading to complaint ; signed by Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker (Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker, ymc)
December 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting STIPULATION #10 setting aside default entry and extending time to file responsive pleadings to Plaintiff's complaint ; signed by Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker (Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker, ymc)
December 17, 2019 Filing 13 PROPOSED ORDER regarding extension of time to file responsive pleading by defendant Schneiderman & Sherman, P.C. (Jacobs, Steven) Modified text on 12/18/2019 (ems).
December 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting STIPULATION #7 ; signed by Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker (Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker, ymc)
December 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #6 motion for extension of time ; signed by Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker (Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker, ymc)
December 16, 2019 Filing 10 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER Setting Aside Default Entry and Extending Time to File Responsive Pleadings by defendant Flagstar Bank, FSB (Santi, Paul)
December 16, 2019 Filing 9 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Flagstar Bank, FSB identifying Corporate Parent Flagstar Bancorp, Inc. for Flagstar Bank, FSB (Santi, Paul) Modified text on 12/16/2019 (ems).
December 13, 2019 Filing 8 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Green Tree Servicing, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Walter Investment Management Corp. for Green Tree Servicing, LLC (Krause, Courtney)
December 13, 2019 Filing 7 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER for Extension of Time to File Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint by defendant Green Tree Servicing, LLC (Krause, Courtney)
December 13, 2019 Filing 6 AGREED MOTION for extension of time to respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by defendant Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC; (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Ritchie, Alan) Modified text on 12/16/2019 (ems).
December 11, 2019 Filing 5 STATE COURT FILE received from 20th Circuit Court for the County of Ottawa (Attachments: #1 Register of Actions, #2 State Court Complaint, #3 Summons, #4 Proofs of Service, #5 Stipulated Order, #6 Default, #7 Notice of Filing Notice of Removal) (ems)
December 10, 2019 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Paul Jacob Santi on behalf of defendant Flagstar Bank, FSB (Santi, Paul)
December 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER setting Rule 16 scheduling conference: Rule 16 scheduling conference is set for 2/19/2020 at 03:00 PM at 699 Federal Building, Grand Rapids, MI before Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker; status report due by 2/12/2020 ; signed by Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker (Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker, ymc) Modified text on 12/10/2019 (ems).
December 10, 2019 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Roger G. Cotner on behalf of plaintiff Tyler J. Forbes (Cotner, Roger)
December 10, 2019 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Steven A. Jacobs on behalf of defendant Schneiderman & Sherman, P.C. and Certificate of Service (Jacobs, Steven)
December 9, 2019 FILING FEE PAID re #1 by defendant Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC in the amount of $400, receipt number AMIWDC-4688400 (Ritchie, Alan)
December 9, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE that this case has been assigned Robert J. Jonker ; with NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY re filing fee (ems)
December 7, 2019 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Courtney Anne Krause on behalf of defendant Green Tree Servicing, LLC (Krause, Courtney)
December 6, 2019 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Anna-Katrina S. Christakis on behalf of defendant Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC (Christakis, Anna-Katrina)
December 6, 2019 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Specialized Loan Servicing Holdings, LLC, Corporate Parent Computershare Limited for Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC (Ritchie, Alan) Modified text on 12/9/2019 (ems).
December 6, 2019 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Alan Ritchie on behalf of defendant Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC (Ritchie, Alan)
December 6, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 20th Circuit Court for the County of Ottawa case number 19-5969-CH filed by Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2 - Consents to Removal) (Ritchie, Alan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Forbes v. Flagstar Bank, FSB et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC
Represented By: Anna-Katrina S. Christakis
Represented By: Alan Ritchie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Flagstar Bank, FSB
Represented By: Paul Jacob Santi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Green Tree Servicing, LLC
Represented By: Courtney Anne Krause
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Schneiderman & Sherman, P.C.
Represented By: Steven A. Jacobs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tyler J. Forbes
Represented By: Roger G. Cotner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?