Jackson v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Mary Elizabeth Jackson
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Interested Party: Social Security Administration
Case Number: 1:2019cv01039
Filed: December 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Phillip J Green
Nature of Suit: Social Security: HIA
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 19, 2019 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Commissioner of Social Security, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General and delivered to US Marshal for service (mg)
December 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting plaintiff leave to proceed in forma pauperis; signed by Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green (jkw)
December 12, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE that this case has been assigned Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green (mg)
December 11, 2019 Filing 3 APPLICATION TO PROCEED without prepayment of fees and affidavit (Robison, Charles)
December 11, 2019 Filing 2 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued re #1 (Robison, Charles)
December 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security filed by Mary Elizabeth Jackson (Robison, Charles)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jackson v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Elizabeth Jackson
Represented By: Charles A. Robison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?