Brewer v. Central Portfolio Control, Inc.
Plaintiff: Joshua K. Brewer
Defendant: Central Portfolio Control, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv01073
Filed: December 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Phillip J Green
Referring Judge: Janet T Neff
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 12, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: early settlement conference set for 7/10/2020 at 09:00 AM at 601 Federal Building, Grand Rapids, MI before Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, rmw)
February 11, 2020 Filing 9 JOINT STATUS REPORT submitted for filing by plaintiff Joshua K. Brewer (Volheim, Nathan)
January 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER regarding preparation of joint status report: joint status report due by 2/18/2020; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, rmw)
January 27, 2020 Filing 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Central Portfolio Control, Inc. (Poncin, Michael)
January 27, 2020 Filing 6 ANSWER to complaint #1 with affirmative defenses by Central Portfolio Control, Inc. (Poncin, Michael)
January 14, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS returned executed; Central Portfolio Control, Inc. served on 1/6/2020, answer due 1/27/2020 (Volheim, Nathan)
December 20, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to defendant Central Portfolio Control, Inc. (mg)
December 20, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE that this case has been assigned Janet T. Neff (mg)
December 19, 2019 Filing 2 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued re #1 (Volheim, Nathan)
December 19, 2019 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Ahmad Tayseer Sulaiman on behalf of plaintiff Joshua K. Brewer (Sulaiman, Ahmad)
December 19, 2019 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Taxiarchis Hatzidimitriadis on behalf of plaintiff Joshua K. Brewer (Hatzidimitriadis, Taxiarchis)
December 19, 2019 FILING FEE PAID re #1 by plaintiff Joshua K. Brewer in the amount of $400, receipt number AMIWDC-4718334 (Volheim, Nathan)
December 19, 2019 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Nathan Charles Volheim on behalf of plaintiff Joshua K. Brewer (Volheim, Nathan)
December 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against Central Portfolio Control, Inc. filed by Joshua K. Brewer (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons) (Volheim, Nathan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brewer v. Central Portfolio Control, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Central Portfolio Control, Inc.
Represented By: Michael Scott Poncin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joshua K. Brewer
Represented By: Taxiarchis Hatzidimitriadis
Represented By: Ahmad Tayseer Sulaiman
Represented By: Nathan Charles Volheim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?