Beck v. International Recovery Partners & Associates, LLC
Plaintiff: Kelly Beck
Defendant: International Recovery Partners & Associates, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv01091
Filed: December 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Sally J Berens
Referring Judge: Janet T Neff
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 28, 2020 Filing 6 DEFAULT ENTERED as to defendant International Recovery Partners & Associates, LLC (ems)
January 28, 2020 Filing 5 APPLICATION for entry of default as to Defendant (Attachments: #1 Affidavit) (Agruss, Michael)
January 6, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS returned executed; International Recovery Partners & Associates, LLC served on 1/6/2020, answer due 1/27/2020 (Agruss, Michael)
December 30, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to defendant International Recovery Partners & Associates, LLC (ems)
December 30, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE that this case has been assigned Janet T. Neff (ems)
December 27, 2019 FILING FEE PAID re #1 by plaintiff Kelly Beck in the amount of $400, receipt number AMIWDC-4743830 (Agruss, Michael)
December 27, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against International Recovery Partners & Associates, LLC filed by Kelly Beck (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons) (Agruss, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Beck v. International Recovery Partners & Associates, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: International Recovery Partners & Associates, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kelly Beck
Represented By: Michael S. Agruss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?