Ceres Farms, LLC v. National Railroad Passenger Corporation
Plaintiff: Ceres Farms, LLC
Defendant: National Railroad Passenger Corporation
Case Number: 1:2020cv00039
Filed: January 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Sally J Berens
Referring Judge: Janet T Neff
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #16 motion for extension of time; additional requests to extend the deadline will not be favored; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, rmw)
March 4, 2020 Filing 18 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by defendant National Railroad Passenger Corporation re THIRD MOTION for extension of time to Answer or Otherwise Plead #16 , Certificate Regarding Motion Concurrence #17 (Lauka, Jeshua)
March 4, 2020 Filing 17 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re THIRD MOTION for extension of time to Answer or Otherwise Plead #16 filed by National Railroad Passenger Corporation (Lauka, Jeshua)
March 4, 2020 Filing 16 THIRD MOTION for extension of time to Answer or Otherwise Plead by defendant National Railroad Passenger Corporation; (Lauka, Jeshua)
February 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #12 motion for extension of time; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, rmw)
February 13, 2020 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by defendant National Railroad Passenger Corporation re SECOND MOTION for extension of time to Answer or Otherwise Plead #12 , Certificate Regarding Motion Concurrence #13 (Lauka, Jeshua)
February 13, 2020 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re SECOND MOTION for extension of time to Answer or Otherwise Plead #12 filed by National Railroad Passenger Corporation (Lauka, Jeshua)
February 13, 2020 Filing 12 SECOND MOTION for extension of time to Answer or Otherwise Plead by defendant National Railroad Passenger Corporation; (Lauka, Jeshua)
February 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER regarding motion for extension of time #9 and certificate of concurrence; the motion is denied without prejudice to refile; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, rmw)
February 12, 2020 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by defendant National Railroad Passenger Corporation re SECOND MOTION for extension of time to Answer or Otherwise Plead #9 (Lauka, Jeshua)
February 12, 2020 Filing 9 SECOND MOTION for extension of time to Answer or Otherwise Plead by defendant National Railroad Passenger Corporation; (Lauka, Jeshua)
January 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #5 unopposed motion for extension of time; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, rmw)
January 22, 2020 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by defendant National Railroad Passenger Corporation re Corporate Disclosure Statement #6 , UNOPPOSED MOTION for extension of time to file answer re #1 Plaintiff's Complaint #5 (Lauka, Jeshua)
January 22, 2020 Filing 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by National Railroad Passenger Corporation (Lauka, Jeshua)
January 22, 2020 Filing 5 UNOPPOSED MOTION for extension of time to file answer re #1 Plaintiff's Complaint by defendant National Railroad Passenger Corporation; (Lauka, Jeshua)
January 21, 2020 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Ceres Farms, LLC (TerMaat, Thomas)
January 21, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE that this case has been assigned Janet T. Neff ; with NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY re corporate disclosure statement (mg)
January 21, 2020 Filing 2 (DISREGARD) NOTICE of receipt of case (mg) Modified text on 1/21/2020 (mg).
January 16, 2020 RECEIPT: in the amount of $400.00 by attorney Jeshua Thomas Lauka on behalf of defendant, receipt number AMIWDC-4807972; for filing fee (mkc)
January 16, 2020 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Thomas R. TerMaat on behalf of plaintiff Ceres Farms, LLC (TerMaat, Thomas)
January 16, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 43rd Circuit Court case number 19-642-CH-s filed by National Railroad Passenger Corporation d/b/a Amtrak (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, State Court summons and complaint #2 Exhibit 1 (State Court complaint exhibit continued - Part 1), #3 Exhibit 1 (State Court complaint exhibit continued - Part 2), #4 Exhibit 2 (State Court complaint) (Lauka, Jeshua) Modified text on 1/21/2020 (mg).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ceres Farms, LLC v. National Railroad Passenger Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Railroad Passenger Corporation
Represented By: Jeshua Thomas Lauka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ceres Farms, LLC
Represented By: Thomas R. TerMaat
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?