Dunkin' Donuts Franchising LLC et al v. G&J Food Service, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Dunkin' Donuts Franchising LLC and DD IP Holder LLC
Defendant: Ghada R. Beydoun and G&J Food Service, LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv00086
Filed: January 31, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Ray Kent
Referring Judge: Paul L Maloney
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1121
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER requiring appropriate closing documents to be submitted by 4/17/2020; signed by District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Judge Paul L. Maloney, acr)
March 18, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE RESCHEDULING MOTION HEARING regarding MOTION for preliminary injunction #11 that was previously set for parties to appear in person; motion hearing is set for 3/20/2020 at 01:30 PM by telephone before District Judge Paul L. Maloney; counsel for plaintiff to coordinate call (Judge Paul L. Maloney, acr)
March 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 STIPULATION AND ORDER; deadline for defendants to file response to complaint extended to 3/11/2020; signed by District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Judge Paul L. Maloney, acr)
February 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 STIPULATION and Order to Extend Defendant's Answer to the Complaint by 14 Days to March 11, 2020 by plaintiffs DD IP Holder LLC, Dunkin' Donuts Franchising LLC (Kelly, Douglas) Modified text on 3/2/2020 (ems).
February 28, 2020 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Danila V. Artaev on behalf of defendant Ghada R. Beydoun (Artaev, Danila)
February 28, 2020 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Danila V. Artaev on behalf of defendant G&J Food Service, LLC (Artaev, Danila)
February 24, 2020 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by plaintiffs DD IP Holder LLC, Dunkin' Donuts Franchising LLC re complaint #1 , Corporate Disclosure Statement,, #5 , Summons Issued #10 , PROPOSED ORDER regarding Motion for Preliminary Injunctive Relief by plaintiff Dunkin' Donuts Franchising LLC #7 , Order Regarding Response to Motion, #13 , MOTION for preliminary injunction #6 (Kelly, Douglas)
February 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER regarding response to Motion for Preliminary Injunction #11 : responses due 3/6/2020; replies due by 3/13/2020; hearing on motion scheduled for 3/20/2020 at 1:30 p.m.; signed by District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Judge Paul L. Maloney, acr)
February 11, 2020 Filing 12 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED upon All Defendants served 2/5/2020, answers due 2/26/2020 (Kelly, Douglas) Modified text on 2/28/2020 (ems).
February 4, 2020 Filing 11 CORRECTED MOTION for preliminary injunction (corrected to comply with Local Civil Rule 10.1) by plaintiff Dunkin' Donuts Franchising LLC; (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit A-1, #3 Exhibit A-2, #4 Exhibit A-3, #5 Exhibit B, #6 Exhibit B-1, #7 Exhibit B-2) (Kelly, Douglas) Modified text on 2/4/2020; this entry replaces #6 (ems).
February 4, 2020 Filing 10 SUMMONS ISSUED as to defendants Ghada R. Beydoun, G&J Food Service, LLC (ems)
February 4, 2020 Filing 9 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued re #1 (Kelly, Douglas)
February 4, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE to attorney Douglas R. Kelly regarding recent filing #6 (ems)
February 3, 2020 RECEIPT: in the amount of $400.00 by Attorney Douglas R. Kelly on behalf of plaintiff, receipt number AMIWDC-4869367; for filing fee (mkc)
February 3, 2020 Filing 7 PROPOSED ORDER regarding Motion for Preliminary Injunctive Relief by plaintiff Dunkin' Donuts Franchising LLC (Kelly, Douglas)
February 3, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for preliminary injunction by plaintiff Dunkin' Donuts Franchising LLC; (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit A-1, #3 Exhibit A-2, #4 Exhibit A-3, #5 Exhibit B, #6 Exhibit B-1, #7 Exhibit B-2) (Kelly, Douglas) Modified text on 2/4/2020 (ems).
February 3, 2020 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Dunkin' Donuts Franchising LLC, DD IP Holder LLC identifying Corporate Parent DB Franchising Holding Company LLC, Corporate Parent DB Master Finance LLC, Corporate Parent Baskin-Robbins International LLC, Corporate Parent Baskin-Robbins Flavors, LLC, Corporate Parent Baskin-Robbins USA LLC, Corporate Parent Baskin-Robbins LLC, Corporate Parent Mister Donut of America LLC, Corporate Parent Dunkin' Donuts USA LLC, Corporate Parent Dunkin' Donuts LLC, Corporate Parent Dunkin' Brands, Inc., Corporate Parent Dunkin' Brands Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent Dunkin' Brands Group, Inc. (Kelly, Douglas) Modified text and filers on 2/4/2020 (ems).
February 3, 2020 Filing 4 REPORT from the Clerk, WDMI, to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office on the filing of a TRADEMARK ACTION (ems)
February 3, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE to attorney Douglas R. Kelly regarding recent filing #1 (ems)
February 3, 2020 SUMMONS NOT ISSUED as to defendants Ghada R. Beydoun, G&J Food Service, LLC (none provided and filing fee not paid) (ems)
February 3, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE that this case has been assigned Paul L. Maloney ; with NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY re filing fee re corporate disclosure statement (ems)
January 31, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Damages and Injunctive Relief against All Defendants filed by Dunkin' Donuts Franchising LLC, DD IP Holder LLC (Kelly, Douglas) Modified text and filers on 2/3/2020 (ems).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dunkin' Donuts Franchising LLC et al v. G&J Food Service, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dunkin' Donuts Franchising LLC
Represented By: Douglas R. Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DD IP Holder LLC
Represented By: Douglas R. Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ghada R. Beydoun
Represented By: Danila V. Artaev
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G&J Food Service, LLC
Represented By: Danila V. Artaev
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?