Hamilton et al v. Muskegon Family Care
Plaintiff: Karisha Melton, Shannon L Hamilton and Shannon L. Hamilton
Defendant: Muskegon Family Care
Case Number: 1:2020cv00141
Filed: February 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Sally J Berens
Referring Judge: Robert J Jonker
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 29:2101
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER setting Rule 16 scheduling conference: Rule 16 scheduling conference is set for 5/4/2020 at 03:00 PM at 699 Federal Building, Grand Rapids, MI before Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker; status report due by 4/27/2020 ; signed by Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker (Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker, ymc)
March 12, 2020 Filing 8 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Muskegon Family Care (Pirrotta, Salvatore)
March 12, 2020 Filing 7 ANSWER to complaint #1 with affirmative defenses by Muskegon Family Care (Pirrotta, Salvatore)
March 12, 2020 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Daniel Robert Schipper on behalf of defendant Muskegon Family Care (Schipper, Daniel)
March 12, 2020 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Salvatore W. Pirrotta on behalf of defendant Muskegon Family Care (Pirrotta, Salvatore)
February 28, 2020 SUMMONS returned executed; Muskegon Family Care served on 2/21/2020, answer due 3/13/2020 (as taken from #5 ) (ems) Modified text on 2/28/2020 (ems).
February 28, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE to attorney Rene S. Roupinian regarding recent filing #5 (ems)
February 28, 2020 Filing 5 PROOF OF SERVICE by plaintiffs Shannon L. Hamilton, Karisha Melton re Summons Issued #4 , complaint #1 (Roupinian, Rene)
February 19, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to defendant Muskegon Family Care (ems)
February 18, 2020 Filing 3 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued re #1 (Roupinian, Rene)
February 18, 2020 SUMMONS NOT ISSUED as to defendant Muskegon Family Care (no proposed summons provided) (ems)
February 18, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE that this case has been assigned Robert J. Jonker (ems)
February 17, 2020 FILING FEE PAID re #1 by plaintiffs Shannon L. Hamilton, Karisha Melton in the amount of $400, receipt number AMIWDC-4917764 (Roupinian, Rene) Modified text on 2/18/2020 (jlb).
February 16, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Muskegon Family Care filed by Shannon L Hamilton, Karisha Melton (Roupinian, Rene)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hamilton et al v. Muskegon Family Care
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karisha Melton
Represented By: Rene S. Roupinian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shannon L Hamilton
Represented By: Rene S. Roupinian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shannon L. Hamilton
Represented By: Rene S. Roupinian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Muskegon Family Care
Represented By: Daniel Robert Schipper
Represented By: Salvatore W. Pirrotta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?