Cleland v. Bayer-Monsanto Company
Plaintiff: Patricia J. Cleland
Defendant: Bayer-Monsanto Company
Case Number: 1:2020cv00149
Filed: February 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Sally J Berens
Referring Judge: Paul L Maloney
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 19, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 19, 2020 ACKNOWLEDGMENT from California Northern District, of receipt of WDMI transfer case, assigning case number 3:20-cv-01912 (ndj)
March 17, 2020 CASE ELECTRONICALLY TRANSFERRED to Northern District of California (mg)
March 12, 2020 Filing 6 COPY of CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation directed to the Northern District of California regarding case to be transferred to the Multidistrict Litigation Panel under MDL No. 2741, Roundup Products Liability Litigation (mg) Modified on text 3/17/2020 (mg).
March 12, 2020 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation; certified copy received from Northern District of California; case transferred to Northern District of California under MDL No. 2741, Roundup Products Liability Litigation (mg) Modified text on 3/17/2020 (mg).
February 20, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS ISSUED as to defendant Bayer-Monsanto Company (mg)
February 20, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE that this case has been assigned Paul L. Maloney (mg)
February 20, 2020 Filing 3 Memorandum regarding potentially related case returned to Clerk from Magistrate Judge Berens indicating that this case is related to case 1:20-cv-46; 1:20-cv-47; 1:20-cv-48; 1:20-cv-150 (jmw)
February 19, 2020 Filing 2 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued re #1 (Doyle, Brion)
February 19, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against Bayer-Monsanto Company filed by Patricia J. Cleland (Doyle, Brion)
February 19, 2020 FILING FEE PAID re #1 by plaintiff Patricia J. Cleland in the amount of $400, receipt number AMIWDC-4930733 (Doyle, Brion)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cleland v. Bayer-Monsanto Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia J. Cleland
Represented By: Brion Bannon Doyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bayer-Monsanto Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?