American Honda Finance Corporation v. Fast Lane Powersports, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: American Honda Finance Corporation
Defendant: Fast Lane Powersports, Inc. and Jeffrey Giles
Case Number: 1:2020cv00245
Filed: March 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Sally J Berens
Referring Judge: Robert J Jonker
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery/Enforcement
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 14, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS ISSUED as to defendants Fast Lane Powersports, Inc., Jeffrey Giles (ns)
March 20, 2020 Filing 7 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued re #6 (Bruinsma, James)
March 20, 2020 Filing 6 CORRECTED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by American Honda Finance Corporation (Attachments: #1 Corrected Exhibit A, #2 Corrected Exhibit B, #3 Corrected Exhibit C, #4 Corrected Exhibit C) (Bruinsma, James) Modified text on 3/20/2020; this entry replaces #1 (ns). Modified text on 3/23/2020 (kvt).
March 20, 2020 FILING FEE PAID re #1 by plaintiff American Honda Finance Corporation in the amount of $400, receipt number AMIWDC-5042041 (Bruinsma, James)
March 20, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE to attorney James Robert Bruinsma regarding recent filing #1 (ns)
March 20, 2020 SUMMONS NOT ISSUED as to defendants Fast Lane Powersports, Inc., Jeffrey Giles ; filing fee due (ns)
March 20, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE that this case has been assigned Robert J. Jonker ; with NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY re filing fee (ns)
March 19, 2020 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by American Honda Finance Corporation (Bruinsma, James)
March 19, 2020 Filing 2 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued re #1 (Bruinsma, James)
March 19, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by American Honda Finance Corporation (Attachments: #1 Exhibits to Complaint) (Bruinsma, James) Modified text on 3/19/2020 (ns).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: American Honda Finance Corporation v. Fast Lane Powersports, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: American Honda Finance Corporation
Represented By: James Robert Bruinsma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fast Lane Powersports, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey Giles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?