Mergos v. Space Exploration Technologies Corporation
Plaintiff: Jennifer Mergos
Defendant: Space Exploration Technologies Corporation
Case Number: 1:2020cv00324
Filed: April 15, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Phillip J Green
Referring Judge: Janet T Neff
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 2, 2020 ACKNOWLEDGMENT from Eastern District of Michigan, of receipt of WDMI transfer case, assigning case number 2:20-cv-11431 (ndj)
June 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE to the Eastern District of Michigan; signed by Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green (jkw)
June 1, 2020 Copy of Order Transferring Case to the Eastern District of Michigan #7 sent via U.S. Mail to Jennifer Mergos (clw)
June 1, 2020 CASE ELECTRONICALLY TRANSFERRED to Eastern District of Michigan (clw)
April 24, 2020 Filing 6 PROOF OF SERVICE by plaintiff Jennifer Mergos re Declaration #5 (clw)
April 24, 2020 Filing 5 DECLARATION of non-consent by plaintiff Jennifer Mergos (clw)
April 20, 2020 Copy of Order to Proceed In Forma Pauperis #4 , Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge #3 sent via U.S. Mail to Jennifer Mergos (jlb)
April 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting plaintiff leave to proceed in forma pauperis; signed by Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green (jkw)
April 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, rmw)
April 15, 2020 Filing 2 APPLICATION TO PROCEED without prepayment of fees and affidavit (clw)
April 15, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Space Exploration Technologies Corporation filed by Jennifer Mergos (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Proposed Summons) (clw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mergos v. Space Exploration Technologies Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Mergos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Space Exploration Technologies Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?