Vander Zwaag et al v. Whitmer et al
Plaintiff: Nathan Vander Zwaag, Chase Turkstra and Henry Jon Freriks
Defendant: Gretchen Whitmer and Daniel Eichenger
Case Number: 1:2020cv00325
Filed: April 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Phillip J Green
Referring Judge: Paul L Maloney
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 29, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL of case filed by plaintiff Nathan Vander Zwaag (Sikkel, William)
April 23, 2020 Copy of documents #1 #2 #3 , and Administrative Order 20-CA-033 #4 sent to attorney Sikkel via e-mail (krv) Modified text on 4/23/2020 (krv)
April 21, 2020 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Joseph T. Froehlich on behalf of defendants Daniel Eichenger, Gretchen Whitmer (Froehlich, Joseph)
April 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER 20-CA-033 regarding the assignment of cognate cases to Paul L. Maloney pursuant to Local Civil Rule 3.3.2(c) and the reassignment of referrals in case 1:20-cv-325 from Magistrate Judge Sally J. Berens to Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green; signed by Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker (kvt)
April 20, 2020 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Robert P. Reichel on behalf of defendants Daniel Eichenger, Gretchen Whitmer (Reichel, Robert)
April 20, 2020 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Joshua O. Booth on behalf of defendants Daniel Eichenger, Gretchen Whitmer (Booth, Joshua)
April 20, 2020 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Neil Anthony Giovanatti on behalf of defendants Daniel Eichenger, Gretchen Whitmer (Giovanatti, Neil)
April 17, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to defendants Daniel Eichenger, Gretchen Whitmer (ns)
April 17, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE that this case has been assigned Paul L. Maloney (ns)
April 16, 2020 RECEIPT: in the amount of $400, receipt number AMIWDC-5140751; for civil filing fee (jlb)
April 16, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Nathan Vander Zwaag (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons) (Sikkel, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vander Zwaag et al v. Whitmer et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nathan Vander Zwaag
Represented By: William A. Sikkel, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chase Turkstra
Represented By: William A. Sikkel, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Henry Jon Freriks
Represented By: William A. Sikkel, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gretchen Whitmer
Represented By: Robert P. Reichel
Represented By: Joshua O. Booth
Represented By: Neil Anthony Giovanatti
Represented By: Joseph T. Froehlich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Eichenger
Represented By: Robert P. Reichel
Represented By: Joshua O. Booth
Represented By: Neil Anthony Giovanatti
Represented By: Joseph T. Froehlich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?