McPherson v. Menard, Inc.
Plaintiff: Shannon Lynn McPherson
Defendant: Menard, Inc.
Not Classified By Court: Facilitative Mediator
Case Number: 1:2020cv00371
Filed: April 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Sally J Berens
Referring Judge: Janet T Neff
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 24, 2020 VFM FEE RECEIVED in the amount of $25.00, check number 1945 as to plaintiff Shannon Lynn McPherson (lep)
June 17, 2020 VFM FEE RECEIVED in the amount of $25.00, check number 11680 as to defendant Menard, Inc. (lep)
June 12, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of appointment of Facilitative Mediator Dale Ann Iverson ; plaintiff VFM fee to be submitted by 6/19/2020 defendant VFM fee to be submitted by 6/19/2020 (lep)
June 9, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Selection of Mediator by defendant Menard, Inc. (Herman, Thomas)
June 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 PROTECTIVE ORDER granting proposed order #7 ; signed by Magistrate Judge Sally J. Berens (cbh)
May 27, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE cancelling 6/9/2020 Rule 16 scheduling conference (Judge Janet T. Neff, rmw)
May 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, rmw)
May 27, 2020 Opinion or Order (NON-DOCUMENT) ORDER REFERRING STIPULATED PROPOSED PROTECTIVE ORDER #7 to Magistrate Judge Sally J. Berens under 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A); signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, rmw)
May 26, 2020 Filing 8 JOINT STATUS REPORT (Herman, Thomas)
May 26, 2020 Filing 7 PROPOSED ORDER regarding Stipulated Protective Order by defendant Menard, Inc. (Herman, Thomas)
May 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER setting Rule 16 scheduling conference: Rule 16 scheduling conference is set for 6/9/2020 at 10:00 AM at 401 Federal Building, Grand Rapids, MI before Judge Janet T. Neff; joint status report due by 6/2/2020; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, rmw)
May 6, 2020 Filing 5 ANSWER to complaint with affirmative defenses and jury demand reliance by Menard, Inc. (Herman, Thomas) Modified text on 5/7/2020 (ems).
April 30, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE that this case has been assigned Janet T. Neff (ems)
April 30, 2020 FILING FEE PAID re #1 by defendant Menard, Inc. in the amount of $400, receipt number AMIWDC-5192066 (Herman, Thomas)
April 30, 2020 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Menard, Inc. (Herman, Thomas)
April 30, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE OF FILING notice of removal re #1 directed to Kent County Circuit Court by defendant Menard, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Removal (State)) (Herman, Thomas) Modified text on 4/30/2020 (ems).
April 30, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL of Cause from Kent County Circuit Court case number 20-02871-NO filed by Menard, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Summons & Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Acknowledgment of Service) (Herman, Thomas) Modified text on 4/30/2020 (ems).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McPherson v. Menard, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Menard, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas G. Herman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shannon Lynn McPherson
Represented By: Garrett J. Tenhave-Chapman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Facilitative Mediator
Represented By: Dale Ann Iverson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?