McKissic #124902 v. Barr et al
Plaintiff: Lonnie McKissic #124902
Defendant: William P. Barr, Dana Nessel, Heidi Washington and Ken McKee
Case Number: 1:2020cv00526
Filed: June 10, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Sally J Berens
Referring Judge: Janet T Neff
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 29, 2020 Copy of Order on Motion to Alter Judgment #15 sent via U.S. Mail to Lonnie McKissic #124902 (tlbu)
July 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER denying #14 motion to alter judgment; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, clb)
July 10, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION to alter judgment and to allow petitioner to amend his complaint by plaintiff Lonnie McKissic #124902; (ems)
July 9, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION to stay re #12 due to premature submission of pleading pending disposition of Rule 59 motion by plaintiff Lonnie McKissic #124902; (ems)
July 1, 2020 Filing 12 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against William P. Barr, Ken McKee, Dana Nessel, Heidi Washington filed by Lonnie McKissic #124902 (ems)
June 29, 2020 Certified Copies of Judgment - Frivolous, Malicious, or for Failure to State a Claim (Prisoner Civil Rights Case) #11 , Opinion (Screening) #9 , Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction, Order on Motion for Order #10 sent via U.S. Mail to Lonnie McKissic #124902 (ems)
June 29, 2020 Filing 11 JUDGMENT that the action is dismissed with prejudice for failure to state a claim; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, clb)
June 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER denying #4 motion for preliminary injunction; denying #6 motion for praecipe; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, clb)
June 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 OPINION; Order and Judgment to issue; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, clb)
June 22, 2020 RECEIPT (Prisoner Litigation): initial filing fee installment in the amount of $84.46, receipt number KZ004142; amount paid to date $84.46 (jlb)
June 11, 2020 Copy of Order to Proceed IFP - Initial Fee Due in 28 Days - Prisoner, #8 sent via U.S. Mail to Lonnie McKissic #124902 (ems)
June 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS and FOR PAYMENT OF FILING FEE: plaintiff to pay an initial partial fee of $84.46 within 28 days; plaintiff to make interim payments until the full fee is paid; (initial partial filing fee to be submitted by 7/9/2020); signed by Magistrate Judge Sally J. Berens (jal)
June 10, 2020 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Lonnie McKissic by plaintiff Lonnie McKissic #124902 (ems)
June 10, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for order for praecipe by plaintiff Lonnie McKissic #124902; (ems)
June 10, 2020 Filing 5 MEMORANDUM in support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction #4 filed by Lonnie McKissic #124902 (ems)
June 10, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for preliminary injunction and declaratory relief and brief in support by plaintiff Lonnie McKissic #124902; (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Proposed Order) (ems)
June 10, 2020 Filing 3 FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT by plaintiff Lonnie McKissic #124902 (Attachments: #1 Financial Documents) (ems)
June 10, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for leave to proceed in forma pauperis by plaintiff Lonnie McKissic #124902; (ems)
June 10, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with magistrate referral and jury demand against William P. Barr, Ken McKee, Dana Nessel, Heidi Washington filed by Lonnie McKissic #124902 (ems)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McKissic #124902 v. Barr et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lonnie McKissic #124902
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William P. Barr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dana Nessel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Heidi Washington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ken McKee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?