Rumery v. Rijo et al
Plaintiff: Erin Rumery
Defendant: Roberto Rijo, Ice Freight, LLC and Wells Fargo Equipment Finance, Inc.
Not Classified By Court: Facilitative Mediator
Case Number: 1:2020cv00529
Filed: June 10, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Ray Kent
Referring Judge: Janet T Neff
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 27, 2020 VFM FEE RECEIVED in the amount of $25.00, check number 71614 as to defendant Roberto Rijo, plaintiff Erin Rumery (mkc)
July 27, 2020 VFM FEE RECEIVED in the amount of $25.00, check number 4947 as to plaintiff Erin Rumery (mkc)
July 23, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE of appointment of Facilitative Mediator Thomas R. Behm ; plaintiff VFM fee to be submitted by 7/30/2020 defendant VFM fee to be submitted by 7/30/2020 (mkc)
July 16, 2020 Filing 14 SELECTION of Thomas R. Behm as facilitative mediator by plaintiff Erin Rumery (Corey, Louis) Modified text on 7/16/2020 (lep).
July 12, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE cancelling 7/21/2020 Rule 16 scheduling conference (Judge Janet T. Neff, rmw)
July 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, rmw)
July 10, 2020 Filing 11 AMENDED JOINT STATUS REPORT (Corey, Louis) Modified text on 7/13/2020 (mg).
July 9, 2020 Filing 10 JOINT STATUS REPORT (Corey, Louis)
July 9, 2020 Filing 9 PROOF OF SERVICE by defendants Ice Freight, LLC, Roberto Rijo for Defendants' Answers to Plaintiff's Interrogatories (Beckwith, Dirk)
June 26, 2020 Filing 8 ANSWER to affirmative defenses by plaintiff Erin Rumery re #6 (Corey, Louis)
June 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER setting Rule 16 scheduling conference: Rule 16 scheduling conference is set for 7/21/2020 at 10:00 AM at 401 Federal Building, Grand Rapids, MI before Judge Janet T. Neff; joint status report due by 7/14/2020; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, rmw)
June 19, 2020 Filing 6 ANSWER to complaint #1 with affirmative defenses by Ice Freight, LLC, Roberto Rijo (Beckwith, Dirk)
June 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: Defendants shall file a corrected answer no later than 7 days from the date of this Order; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, rmw)
June 15, 2020 FILING FEE PAID re #1 by defendants Ice Freight, LLC, Roberto Rijo in the amount of $400, receipt number AMIWDC-5352592 (Beckwith, Dirk)
June 15, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE that this case has been assigned Janet T. Neff ; with NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY re filing fee (mg)
June 11, 2020 Filing 3 AMENDED CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Ice Freight, LLC (Beckwith, Dirk) Modified text on 6/15/2020 (mg).
June 11, 2020 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Ice Freight, LLC (Beckwith, Dirk)
June 10, 2020 ANSWER to complaint #1 with affirmative defenses (as taken from #1 Exhibit 4, page ID 65-71) by Ice Freight, LLC, Roberto Rijo (mg)
June 10, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Kalamazoo County Circuit Court case number 20-000020-NI filed by Roberto Rijo, Ice Freight, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Summons & Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Discovery Docs, #3 Exhibit C - Affidavit, #4 Exhibit D - State Court Docs -Amended summons and complaint, dismissal of defendant Wells Fargo Equipment Finance, Inc. , Answer to amended complaint #5 Index) (Beckwith, Dirk) Modified text on 6/15/2020 (mg).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rumery v. Rijo et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roberto Rijo
Represented By: Dirk H. Beckwith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ice Freight, LLC
Represented By: Dirk H. Beckwith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Equipment Finance, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Erin Rumery
Represented By: Louis G. Corey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Facilitative Mediator
Represented By: Thomas R. Behm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?