Farmer v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Daniel Richard Farmer
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Interested Party: Social Security Administration
Case Number: 1:2020cv00562
Filed: June 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Sally J Berens
Nature of Suit: Social Security: HIA
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 7, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SUMMONS returned executed by US Marshal on Commissioner of Social Security, US Attorney and US Attorney General; service upon defendant, Commissioner of Social Security complete on 7/20/2020, answer due 9/18/2020 (mg)
June 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting plaintiff leave to proceed in forma pauperis; signed by Magistrate Judge Sally J. Berens (jal)
June 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE that this case has been assigned Magistrate Judge Sally J. Berens (mlc)
June 22, 2020 Opinion or Order SUMMONS ISSUED as to Commissioner of Social Security, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General and delivered to US Marshal for service (kw)
June 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued re #1 (Robison, Charles)
June 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 APPLICATION TO PROCEED without prepayment of fees and affidavit (Robison, Charles)
June 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security filed by Daniel Richard Farmer (Robison, Charles) Modified on 6/19/2020 (jlg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Farmer v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Richard Farmer
Represented By: Charles A. Robison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?