Wilson v. Peckham, Inc.
Plaintiff: LORI WILSON
Defendant: Peckham, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv00565
Filed: June 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Phillip J Green
Referring Judge: Janet T Neff
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 10, 2020 Filing 14 RESPONSE TO REQUEST for pre-motion conference by plaintiff Lori Wilson #13 ; filed by Peckham, Inc. filed by Peckham, Inc. (Eldridge, Scott)
August 3, 2020 Filing 13 REQUEST for pre-motion conference by plaintiff Lori Wilson by plaintiff Lori Wilson; (Young, Jesse)
August 3, 2020 Filing 12 RESPONSE TO REQUEST for pre-motion conference by defendant Peckham, Inc. #8 ; filed by Lori Wilson filed by Lori Wilson (Young, Jesse)
July 28, 2020 Filing 11 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Peckham, Inc. (Eldridge, Scott)
July 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting STIPULATION #7 ; Answer due September 4, 2020; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, clb)
July 27, 2020 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re REQUEST for pre-motion conference by defendant Peckham, Inc. #8 filed by Peckham, Inc. (Eldridge, Scott)
July 27, 2020 Filing 8 REQUEST for pre-motion conference by defendant Peckham, Inc. (Eldridge, Scott)
July 27, 2020 Filing 7 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint by defendant Peckham, Inc. (Eldridge, Scott)
July 20, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS returned executed; Peckham, Inc. served on 7/14/2020, answer due 8/4/2020 (Young, Jesse)
July 17, 2020 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Ashley N. Higginson on behalf of defendant Peckham, Inc. (Higginson, Ashley)
July 17, 2020 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Scott Robert Eldridge on behalf of defendant Peckham, Inc. (Eldridge, Scott)
June 22, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Filing of Consents to Join - First Notice by plaintiff Lori Wilson (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Consent to Join) (Young, Jesse)
June 22, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to defendant Peckham, Inc. (ns)
June 22, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE that this case has been assigned Janet T. Neff (ns)
June 19, 2020 Filing 2 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued re #1 (Young, Jesse)
June 19, 2020 FILING FEE PAID re #1 by plaintiff Lori Wilson in the amount of $400, receipt number AMIWDC-5373190 (Young, Jesse) Modified text on 6/22/2020 (jlg)
June 19, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand Collective Action against Peckham, Inc. filed by Lori Wilson (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Consent to Join, #2 Exhibit B - U.S. Department of Labor, Wage and Hour Division, Fact Sheet #64) (Young, Jesse) Modified text on 6/22/2020 (jlg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wilson v. Peckham, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peckham, Inc.
Represented By: Scott Robert Eldridge
Represented By: Ashley N. Higginson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LORI WILSON
Represented By: Jesse Lee Randolph Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?