Hammonds #611668 v. Burton
Petitioner: Billy Hammonds #611668
Respondent: DeWayne Burton
Case Number: 1:2020cv00592
Filed: July 1, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Ray Kent
Referring Judge: Janet T Neff
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 11, 2020 Filing 7 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE by certified mail upon Attorney General August 5, 2020 (slk)
August 3, 2020 Copy of Order to Answer (Habeas), #6 sent via U.S. Mail to Billy Hammonds (mlc)
August 3, 2020 SERVICE by CERTIFIED MAIL in a habeas action: copy of habeas petition and order to answer sent by certified mail, article number 7015 1520 0002 0362 5922 as to the Attorney General; Respondent DeWayne Burton served via regular mail (mlc)
July 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER TO FILE ANSWER OR OTHER PLEADING: the Clerk to serve a copy of the petition and brief by regular mail on the respondent and one copy by certified mail on the Attorney General of the State of MI; respondent to answer the habeas petition within 180 days; no extensions will be granted; signed by Magistrate Judge Ray Kent (fhw)
July 7, 2020 Copy of Order to Proceed IFP (Habeas) #5 sent via U.S. Mail to Billy Hammonds #611668 (jlb)
July 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting petitioner leave to proceed in forma pauperis in a habeas action; signed by Magistrate Judge Ray Kent (fhw)
July 1, 2020 Filing 4 PROOF OF SERVICE by petitioner Billy Hammonds #611668 re Affidavit in Support #3 , Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus #1 , APPLICATION TO PROCEED without prepayment of fees and affidavit #2 (mg)
July 1, 2020 Filing 3 AFFIDAVIT in support of Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees #2 filed by Billy Hammonds #611668 (mg)
July 1, 2020 Filing 2 APPLICATION TO PROCEED without prepayment of fees and affidavit (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1, #2 Financial Documents) (mg)
July 1, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for writ of habeas corpus filed by Billy Hammonds #611668 (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1, #2 Attachment Cover letter) (mg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hammonds #611668 v. Burton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: DeWayne Burton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Billy Hammonds #611668
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?