Frankenmuth Mutual Insurance Company v. Specialized Component Parts Limited, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Frankenmuth Mutual Insurance Company
Defendant: Electrolux Home Products, Inc. and Specialized Component Parts Limited, LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv00601
Filed: July 1, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Phillip J Green
Referring Judge: Janet T Neff
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 24, 2020 Filing 18 ANSWER to complaint, #1 with affirmative defenses and jury demand by Specialized Component Parts Limited, LLC (Kalamaros, Philip)
August 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting stipulated proposed order #16 ; Defendant Electrolux Home Products, Inc.'s answer or other responsive pleading due 9/16/2020; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, rmw)
August 20, 2020 Filing 16 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER Extending Responsive Pleading Deadline by defendant Electrolux Home Products, Inc. (Rucker, Bryce)
August 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER denying without prejudice stipulated proposed order #14 ; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, rmw)
August 19, 2020 Filing 14 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER Extending Responsive Pleading Deadline by defendant Electrolux Home Products, Inc. (Rucker, Bryce)
July 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting STIPULATION #12 ; Answer due on or before August 26, 2020; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, clb)
July 30, 2020 Filing 12 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER Extending Responsive Pleading Deadline by defendant Electrolux Home Products, Inc. (Rucker, Bryce)
July 30, 2020 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Bryce A. Rucker on behalf of defendant Electrolux Home Products, Inc. (Rucker, Bryce)
July 29, 2020 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Harold D. Pope on behalf of defendant Electrolux Home Products, Inc. (Pope, Harold)
July 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting STIPULATION #10 ; Defendant Specialized Component Parts Limited, LLC's answer or other responsive pleading due 8/24/2020; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, rmw)
July 22, 2020 Filing 10 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER Extending Answer Due Date by defendant Specialized Component Parts Limited, LLC (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Kalamaros, Philip)
July 15, 2020 Filing 9 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Specialized Component Parts Limited, LLC identifying Corporate Parent SCP Holdings, Inc. for Specialized Component Parts Limited, LLC (Kalamaros, Philip)
July 13, 2020 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Philip E. Kalamaros on behalf of defendant Specialized Component Parts Limited, LLC (Kalamaros, Philip)
July 7, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS returned executed; Electrolux Home Products, Inc. served on 7/6/2020, answer due 7/27/2020 (Levy, Jonathan)
July 7, 2020 SUMMONS returned executed; Specialized Component Parts Limited, LLC served on 7/6/2020, answer due 7/27/2020 (as taken from #6 ) (ems) Modified text on 7/7/2020 (ems).
July 7, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE to attorney Jonathan M. Levy regarding recent filing #6 (ems)
July 7, 2020 Filing 6 PROOF OF SERVICE by plaintiff Frankenmuth Mutual Insurance Company for Summons Served on Specialized Component Parts Limited, LLC (Levy, Jonathan)
July 2, 2020 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Jonathan M. Levy on behalf of plaintiff Frankenmuth Mutual Insurance Company (Levy, Jonathan)
July 2, 2020 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Frankenmuth Mutual Insurance Company (Carroll, Philip)
July 2, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to defendants Electrolux Home Products, Inc., Specialized Component Parts Limited, LLC (ems)
July 2, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE that this case has been assigned Janet T. Neff ; with NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY re corporate disclosure statement (ems)
July 1, 2020 Filing 2 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued re #1 (Carroll, Philip)
July 1, 2020 FILING FEE PAID re #1 by plaintiff Frankenmuth Mutual Insurance Company in the amount of $400, receipt number AMIWDC-5414249 (Carroll, Philip)
July 1, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against Electrolux Home Products, Inc., Specialized Component Parts Limited, LLC filed by Frankenmuth Mutual Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Carroll, Philip) Modified text on 7/2/2020 (ems).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Frankenmuth Mutual Insurance Company v. Specialized Component Parts Limited, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Electrolux Home Products, Inc.
Represented By: Bryce A. Rucker
Represented By: Harold D. Pope
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Specialized Component Parts Limited, LLC
Represented By: Philip E. Kalamaros
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frankenmuth Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Philip T. Carroll
Represented By: Jonathan M. Levy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?