Tandem Consulting Group, LLC v. Zaktuary, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Tandem Consulting Group, LLC
Defendant: Rone Davis, Zachary L. Kenne and Zaktuary, LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv00624
Filed: July 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Ray Kent
Referring Judge: Janet T Neff
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 21, 2020 FILING FEE PAID re #1 by plaintiff Tandem Consulting Group, LLC in the amount of $400, receipt number AMIWDC-5484414 (McMahon, Brian)
July 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: Plaintiff shall, not later than 7/24/2020, pay the $400.00 filing fee or move for leave to proceed in forma pauperis; placing Plaintiff on notice concerning potential dismissal; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, rmw)
July 13, 2020 SUMMONS NOT ISSUED as to defendants Rone Davis, Zachary L. Kenne, Zaktuary, LLC (filing fee due as of 7/13/2020) (pjw)
July 10, 2020 Filing 4 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued re #1 (McMahon, Brian)
July 10, 2020 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Tandem Consulting Group, LLC (McMahon, Brian)
July 10, 2020 SUMMONS NOT ISSUED as to defendants Rone Davis, Zachary L. Kenne, Zaktuary, LLC (filing fee due) (clw)
July 10, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE that this case has been assigned Janet T. Neff ; with NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY re filing fee re corporate disclosure statement (clw)
July 9, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Tandem Consulting Group, LLC (Attachments: #1 Summons) (McMahon, Brian)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tandem Consulting Group, LLC v. Zaktuary, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rone Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zachary L. Kenne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zaktuary, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tandem Consulting Group, LLC
Represented By: Brian Patrick McMahon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?