Holbrook #767925 v. Vashaw
Petitioner: RESTRICTED FILER Charles Judson Holbrook #767925
Respondent: Bob Vashaw
Case Number: 1:2020cv00645
Filed: July 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Phillip J Green
Referring Judge: Paul L Maloney
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 28, 2020 Certified Copy of Order Transferring Case to CCA (Habeas) #8 sent via U.S. Mail to Charles Judson Holbrook #767925 (ns)
August 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER TRANSFERRING HABEAS CASE to the Sixth Circuit Court of Appeals as second/successive; signed by Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green (jkw)
August 24, 2020 Filing 7 LETTER from Charles Judson Holbrook #767925 re #6 (ns)
August 20, 2020 Filing 6 AMENDED PETITION for writ of habeas corpus filed by Charles Judson Holbrook #767925 (pjw)
July 29, 2020 Copy of Order to File Amended Pleading on the Form #5 with a required form sent via U.S. Mail to Charles Judson Holbrook #767925 (ns)
July 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER directing the filing party to submit an amended pleading in proper form within 28 days or the action may be dismissed; signed by Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green (jkw)
July 16, 2020 Copy of Receipt of Case Notice #4 sent via U.S. Mail to Charles Judson Holbrook #767925 (ns)
July 16, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of receipt of case (ns)
July 16, 2020 Filing 3 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from Ohio Southern, their case number 1:20-cv-00501; the documents listed above were electronically transferred to the Western District of Michigan (jlg)
July 15, 2020 Case transferred to the United States District Court for the Western District of Michigan. Case file and docket sheet sent Electronically. (km) [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 7/16/2020.]
July 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER transferring this matter to the United States District Court for the Western District of Michigan for all further proceedings. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman on 7/15/2020. (km)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.) [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 7/16/2020.]
June 29, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Charles Holbrook, r. (Case received as scanned). (eh) [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 7/16/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Holbrook #767925 v. Vashaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Bob Vashaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: RESTRICTED FILER Charles Judson Holbrook #767925
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?