Otworth v. Curtis
Plaintiff: Clarence Otworth
Defendant: Pam Curtis
Case Number: 1:2020cv00651
Filed: July 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Sally J Berens
Referring Judge: Robert J Jonker
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 8, 2020 Filing 27 RESPONSE TO MOTION to dismiss for failure to state a claim #17 with certificate of service filed by Clarence Otworth (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (ems)
September 2, 2020 Filing 26 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by defendant Pam Curtis re MOTION for protective order #25 (Lang, Brian)
September 2, 2020 Filing 25 MOTION for protective order by defendant Pam Curtis; (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support of Defendant's Motion for Protective Order, #2 Exhibit 1 - Certificate of Efforts, #3 Exhibit 2 - Plf's Requests for Production of Documents, #4 Exhibit 3 - Plf's First Set of Interrogatories, #5 Proposed Order) (Lang, Brian) Modified text on 9/3/2020 (ems).
August 31, 2020 Filing 24 APPLICATION for entry of default as to defendant Pam Curtis (DEFAULT NOT ENTERED due to dispositive motion filed 8/26/20 as #17 ) (ems) Modified text on 9/1/2020 (ems).
August 28, 2020 Filing 23 LETTER from plaintiff Clarence Otworth requesting subpoenas; three (3) AO88B subpoena forms (signed but otherwise blank) with Subpoena Notice mailed to plaintiff 9/1/20 (ems)
August 28, 2020 Copy of Order Regarding Response to Motion #21 sent via U.S. Mail to Clarence Otworth (ems)
August 27, 2020 Filing 22 COPY OF LETTER from plaintiff Clarence Otworth to the Office of the Circuit Executive (ems) Modified text on 8/28/2020 (ems).
August 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER regarding response to Defendant's motion to dismiss; response brief due within 28 days after service of the motion ; signed by Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker (Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker, ymc)
August 26, 2020 Filing 20 NOTICE to attorney Tamara Mia Reeves regarding recent filing #17 (ems)
August 26, 2020 Filing 19 NOTICE to attorney Tamara Mia Reeves regarding recent filing #17 (ems)
August 26, 2020 Filing 18 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by defendant Pam Curtis re MOTION to dismiss for failure to state a claim #17 (Reeves, Tamara)
August 26, 2020 Filing 17 MOTION to dismiss for failure to state a claim by defendant Pam Curtis; (Attachments: #1 Attachment Brief in Support of Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2) (Reeves, Tamara)
August 21, 2020 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by defendant Pam Curtis for Responses to Requests for Admission (Reeves, Tamara)
August 12, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE of Apology by plaintiff Clarence Otworth (ems)
August 12, 2020 Filing 14 COPY OF LETTER from plaintiff Clarence Otworth to the Honorable Donald John Trump (ems) Modified text on 8/12/2020 (ems).
August 11, 2020 Filing 13 COPY OF LETTER from plaintiff Clarence Otworth to Warner Norcross & Judd LLP (Muskegon) (ems) Modified text on 8/11/2020 (ems).
August 10, 2020 Filing 12 RESPONSE TO #6 with certificate of service filed by plaintiff Clarence Otworth (ems)
August 7, 2020 Filing 11 RESPONSE TO MOTION for extension of time to file answer re #1 or Otherwise Respond #7 with certificate of service filed by Clarence Otworth (ems)
August 4, 2020 Copy of Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer #10 sent via U.S. Mail to Clarence Otworth (ems)
August 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #7 motion for extension of time to answer; signed by Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker (Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker, sdb)
August 3, 2020 Copy of Order on Motion for Recusal #6 sent via U.S. Mail to Clarence Otworth (ems)
July 31, 2020 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by defendant Pam Curtis re MOTION for extension of time to file answer re #1 or Otherwise Respond #7 , Brief in Support of a Motion, #8 (Lang, Brian)
July 31, 2020 Filing 8 BRIEF in support of MOTION for extension of time to file answer re #1 or Otherwise Respond #7 filed by Pam Curtis (Attachments: #1 Attachment Certificate of Efforts to Comply with Local Civ. R. 7.1(d), #2 Proposed Order) (Lang, Brian)
July 31, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for extension of time to file answer re #1 or Otherwise Respond by defendant Pam Curtis; (Lang, Brian)
July 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER denying #5 motion for recusal; no further action on the Show Cause Order is warranted at this time; signed by Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker (Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker, sdb)
July 30, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for recusal and RESPONSE to #3 by plaintiff Clarence Otworth; (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (mg)
July 29, 2020 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Tamara Mia Reeves on behalf of defendant Pam Curtis (Reeves, Tamara)
July 29, 2020 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Brian T. Lang on behalf of defendant Pam Curtis (Lang, Brian)
July 24, 2020 Filing 4 PROOF OF MAILING by plaintiff Clarence Otworth re complaint #1 to defendant via certified mail (ems)
July 22, 2020 Copy of Order to Show Cause (Deadline) #3 sent via U.S. Mail to Clarence Otworth (ems)
July 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Plaintiff to show cause by 8/10/2020 why the case should not be dismissed for lack of subject matter jurisdiction ; signed by Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker (Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker, ymc)
July 16, 2020 SUMMONS ISSUED as to defendant Pam Curtis and returned to plaintiff via mail (ems) Modified text on 7/16/2020 (ems).
July 16, 2020 Copy of Receipt of Case Notice #2 sent via U.S. Mail to Clarence Otworth (ems)
July 16, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of receipt of case (ems)
July 16, 2020 RECEIPT: in the amount of $400.00, receipt number GR071366; for civil filing fee (ems)
July 16, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against Pam Curtis filed by Clarence Otworth (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons) (ems)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Otworth v. Curtis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clarence Otworth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pam Curtis
Represented By: Brian T. Lang
Represented By: Tamara Mia Reeves
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?