Lockett v. American Axle & Manufacturing, Inc.
Plaintiff: Tracy Lockett
Defendant: American Axle & Manufacturing, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv00653
Filed: July 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Sally J Berens
Referring Judge: Paul L Maloney
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29:2601
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 28, 2020 Filing 11 (RESTRICTED ACCESS) DOCUMENT Conference call instructions for 9/29/2020 hearing [Access to this document is available to the Court and attorney(s) for American Axle & Manufacturing, Inc., Tracy Lockett only] (jal)
August 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER setting Rule 16 scheduling conference: Rule 16 scheduling conference is set for 9/29/2020 at 10:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Sally J. Berens; status report due by 9/24/2020; signed by Magistrate Judge Sally J. Berens (jal)
August 25, 2020 Filing 9 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by American Axle & Manufacturing, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent American Axle & Manufacturing Holdings, Inc. for American Axle & Manufacturing, Inc. (Davis, Thomas)
August 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER that Defendant American Axle & Manufacturing, Inc. file a corporate disclosure statement within 7 days; signed by District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Judge Paul L. Maloney, acr)
August 24, 2020 Filing 7 ANSWER to complaint #1 with affirmative defenses by American Axle & Manufacturing, Inc. (Davis, Thomas) Modified text on 8/25/2020 (pjw).
August 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STIPULATION AND ORDER; deadline for defendant to answer or otherwise respond to complaint extended to 8/24/2020; signed by District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Judge Paul L. Maloney, acr)
August 4, 2020 Filing 5 PROPOSED ORDER regarding Stipulated Order on Deadline to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by defendant American Axle & Manufacturing, Inc. (Davis, Thomas)
August 4, 2020 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Thomas John Davis on behalf of defendant American Axle & Manufacturing, Inc. (Davis, Thomas)
August 4, 2020 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of William Bruce Forrest, III on behalf of defendant American Axle & Manufacturing, Inc. (Forrest, William)
July 17, 2020 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Jason Ryan Pelak on behalf of plaintiff Tracy Lockett (Pelak, Jason)
July 17, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to defendant American Axle & Manufacturing, Inc. (pjw)
July 17, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE that this case has been assigned Paul L. Maloney (pjw)
July 16, 2020 Filing 2 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued re #1 (Asch, Marc)
July 16, 2020 FILING FEE PAID re #1 by plaintiff Tracy Lockett in the amount of $400, receipt number AMIWDC-5469887 (Asch, Marc)
July 16, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants filed by Tracy Lockett (Asch, Marc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lockett v. American Axle & Manufacturing, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tracy Lockett
Represented By: Marc A. Asch
Represented By: Jason Ryan Pelak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Axle & Manufacturing, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas John Davis
Represented By: William Bruce Forrest, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?