Wilkins v. UNUM Life Insurance Company of America
Plaintiff: Joe Wilkins
Defendant: UNUM Life Insurance Company of America
Case Number: 1:2020cv00660
Filed: July 20, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Phillip J Green
Referring Judge: Janet T Neff
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 28:1001
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER setting Rule 16 scheduling conference: Rule 16 scheduling conference is set for 10/13/2020 at 11:30 AM at by video before Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green; status report due by 10/7/2020; signed by Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green (jkw)
September 16, 2020 Filing 8 ANSWER to complaint #1 with affirmative defenses by UNUM Life Insurance Company of America (Portinga, D.)
September 16, 2020 Filing 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by UNUM Life Insurance Company of America identifying Corporate Parent UNUM Group for UNUM Life Insurance Company of America (Portinga, D.)
September 15, 2020 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of D. Andrew Portinga on behalf of defendant UNUM Life Insurance Company of America (Portinga, D.)
July 23, 2020 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Joe Wilkins as to UNUM Life Insurance Company of America waiver sent on 7/23/2020, answer due 9/21/2020 (Liepshutz, Greg)
July 21, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS ISSUED as to defendant UNUM Life Insurance Company of America (ns)
July 21, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE that this case has been assigned Janet T. Neff (ns)
July 20, 2020 Filing 3 CORRECTED PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued re #1 (Liepshutz, Greg) Modified text on 7/21/2020; this entry replaces entry #2 (ns).
July 20, 2020 Filing 2 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued re #1 (Liepshutz, Greg)
July 20, 2020 FILING FEE PAID re #1 by plaintiff Joe Wilkins in the amount of $400, receipt number AMIWDC-5478956 (Liepshutz, Greg) Modified text on 7/20/2020 (jlg)
July 20, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against UNUM Life Insurance Company of America filed by Joe Wilkins (Liepshutz, Greg) Modified text on 7/20/2020 (jlg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wilkins v. UNUM Life Insurance Company of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNUM Life Insurance Company of America
Represented By: D. Andrew Portinga
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joe Wilkins
Represented By: Greg Mitchell Liepshutz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?