Phillips-Addis #420015 v. Haske et al
Plaintiff: Andrew J. Phillips-Addis #420015
Defendant: K. Johnson, R. McCary, Unknown Ward, Unknown Best, Kenneth Maceachern, Jeffrey Clouse, Les Parish, Jason Mucha, Heidi Washington, Michael Haske, Noah Bottrell, J. Spencley and D. Weller
Case Number: 1:2020cv00686
Filed: July 27, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Phillip J Green
Referring Judge: Robert J Jonker
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 14, 2020 Filing 17 LETTER from Andrew J. Phillips-Addis #420015 (ns)
September 14, 2020 Filing 16 LETTER from Andrew J. Phillips-Addis #420015 regarding filing fee (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1) (ns)
September 14, 2020 Copy of Order on Motion to Amend/Correct #15 sent via U.S. Mail to Andrew J. Phillips-Addis #420015 (ems)
September 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER denying #4 , #7 , #8 , #9 , #10 , #11 , #12 , #13 , #14 ; signed by Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker (Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker, ymc)
September 8, 2020 Filing 14 LETTER from plaintiff Andrew J. Phillips-Addis #420015 claiming this case was opened in error and requesting docket sheet; docket sheet mailed to plaintiff 9/9/20 (ems)
September 1, 2020 RECEIPT (Prisoner Litigation): filing fee installment in the amount of $60.50, receipt number GR071787; amount paid to date $350.00 (mkc)
August 31, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION to amend/correct error on court's ruling (with proof of service) by plaintiff Andrew J. Phillips-Addis #420015; (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1) (ems)
August 28, 2020 Filing 12 SUPPLEMENT re MOTION to amend/correct #1 named as, "motions of corrections and errors" #10 by plaintiff Andrew J. Phillips-Addis #420015 (mlc)
August 28, 2020 Filing 11 SUPPLEMENT re MOTION to amend/correct #1 named as, "motions of corrections and errors" #10 named as, "motion corrected all errors of filing" by plaintiff Andrew J. Phillips-Addis #420015 (mlc)
August 28, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION to amend/correct #1 named as, "motions of corrections and errors" by plaintiff Andrew J. Phillips-Addis #420015; (mlc)
August 26, 2020 NOTE: $122.00 from receipt numbers GR071698, GR071699, GR071700 and GR071701, dated 8/20/2020 was transferred to this case from case number 1:20-CV-620 ; total paid to date in this case is $289.50 (Financial Administrator, ced)
August 24, 2020 RECEIPT (Prisoner Litigation): filing fee installment in the amount of $41.50, receipt number GR071730; amount paid to date $167.50 (mkc) Modified text on 9/9/2020 (mkc).
August 24, 2020 Filing 9 LETTER from plaintiff Andrew J. Phillips-Addis #420015 regarding the incorrect opening of this case (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1) (ems) Modified text on 8/25/2020 (ems).
August 20, 2020 Filing 8 LETTER from plaintiff Andrew J. Phillips-Addis #420015 regarding the opening of this case (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1) (ems)
August 19, 2020 Filing 7 LETTER from plaintiff Andrew J. Phillips-Addis #420015 regarding the opening of this case; Response from Clerk and docket sheet mailed to plaintiff 8/19/20 (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1, #2 Response from Clerk) (ems)
August 17, 2020 NOTE: $53.00 from receipt number GR071626, dated 8/11/20 was transferred to this case from case number 1:20-CV-620 ; total paid to date in this case is $126.00 (Financial Administrator, ced) Modified text on 9/9/2020 (mkc).
August 13, 2020 RECEIPT (Prisoner Litigation): filing fee installment in the amount of $26.00, receipt number GR0071644; amount paid to date $73.00 (mkc)
August 12, 2020 Copy of Order to Proceed IFP - Initial Fee Due in 28 Days - Prisoner, #6 sent via U.S. Mail to Andrew J. Phillips-Addis #420015 (ems)
August 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS and FOR PAYMENT OF FILING FEE: plaintiff to pay an initial partial fee of $9.06 within 28 days; plaintiff to make interim payments until the full fee is paid;initial partial filing fee to be submitted by 9/8/2020; signed by Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green (jkw)
August 11, 2020 Filing 5 PRISONER FINANCIAL DOCUMENT(S) (cure deficiency): Certificate of Prisoner Institutional/Trust Fund Account Statement and MDOC Trust Account Statement form the period 8/5/19 to 8/5/20 submitted by plaintiff Andrew J. Phillips-Addis #420015 to cure deficiency (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1) (ems)
August 10, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION to amend/correct #1 to a miscellaneous case by plaintiff Andrew J. Phillips-Addis #420015; (ems)
August 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 DEFICIENCY ORDER: plaintiff has failed to pay the filing fee or file the required documents to apply to proceed in forma pauperis; deficiency to be cured by 9/8/2020 or the action will be dismissed filing fee to be submitted by 9/8/2020; signed by Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green (jkw)
August 10, 2020 Copy of Deficiency Order, #3 sent via U.S. Mail to Andrew J. Phillips-Addis #420015 (ems)
July 27, 2020 Filing 2 LETTER from plaintiff Andrew J. Phillips-Addis #420015 regarding status of case; court docket sheet mailed to plaintiff (pjw)
July 27, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with magistrate referral (titled Motion of Registration Judgment) against All Defendants filed by Andrew J. Phillips-Addis #420015 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (pjw)
July 27, 2020 RECEIPT (Prisoner Litigation): initial filing fee installment in the amount of $47.00, receipt number GR071479; amount paid to date $47.00 (pjw) Modified text on 8/10/2020 (ems).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Phillips-Addis #420015 v. Haske et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew J. Phillips-Addis #420015
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. McCary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Ward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Best
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth Maceachern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey Clouse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Les Parish
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Mucha
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Heidi Washington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Haske
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Noah Bottrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Spencley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. Weller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?