Worstell v. Amazon.Com Services, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Jacquelyn Worstell
Defendant: Amanda L. Rohrer, Amazon Logistics, Inc., Amazon.Com Services, Inc. doing business as Amazon Fulfillment Services, Inc., Out 4 Delivery, LLC and Amazon.Com Services, Inc. a Registered Michigan Foreign Corporation doing business as Amazon Fulfillment Services, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv00701
Filed: July 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Phillip J Green
Referring Judge: Paul L Maloney
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 23, 2020 Filing 12 STIPULATION of dismissal by defendants Amazon Logistics, Inc., Amazon.Com Services, Inc. (Stiglich, John)
August 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER approving STIPULATION #10 ; deadline for defendants Out 4 Delivery, LLC, Amanda L. Rohrer to file responsive pleading is extended to 9/28/2020; signed by District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Judge Paul L. Maloney, acr)
August 31, 2020 Filing 10 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER Extending Answer Due Date by defendants Out 4 Delivery, LLC, Amanda L. Rohrer (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Kalamaros, Philip) Modified text on 8/31/2020 (ems).
August 28, 2020 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Philip E. Kalamaros on behalf of defendants Out 4 Delivery, LLC, Amanda L. Rohrer (Kalamaros, Philip)
August 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER approving STIPULATION #8 ; deadline for defendants Amazon Logistics, Inc. and Amazon.Com Services, Inc. to file responsive pleading extended to 9/21/2020; signed by District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Judge Paul L. Maloney, acr)
August 25, 2020 Filing 8 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER for Enlargment of Time for Amazon Defendants to file Responsive Pleadings to Plaintiff's Complaint by defendants Amazon Logistics, Inc., Amazon.Com Services, Inc. (Stiglich, John)
August 25, 2020 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of John T. Eads, III on behalf of defendants Amazon Logistics, Inc., Amazon.Com Services, Inc. (Eads, John)
August 25, 2020 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of John Charles Stiglich, II on behalf of defendants Amazon Logistics, Inc., Amazon.Com Services, Inc. (Stiglich, John)
August 19, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS returned executed; Amazon.Com Services, Inc. served on 8/10/2020, answer due 8/31/2020 (Marco, James)
August 19, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS returned executed; Amazon Logistics, Inc. served on 8/10/2020, answer due 8/31/2020 (Marco, James)
August 12, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS returned executed; Out 4 Delivery, LLC served on 8/5/2020, answer due 8/26/2020 (Marco, James)
August 12, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS returned executed; Amanda L. Rohrer served on 8/5/2020, answer due 8/26/2020 (Marco, James)
July 31, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to defendants Amazon Logistics, Inc., Amazon.Com Services, Inc., Out 4 Delivery, LLC, Amanda L. Rohrer (ns)
July 31, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE that this case has been assigned Paul L. Maloney (ns)
July 30, 2020 RECEIPT: in the amount of $400.00 by attorney James Marco on behalf of plaintiff, receipt number AMIWDC-5517603 (jlg)
July 30, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants filed by Jacquelyn Worstell (Attachments: #1 Summons) (Marco, James) Modified text on 7/30/2020 (jlg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Worstell v. Amazon.Com Services, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amanda L. Rohrer
Represented By: Philip E. Kalamaros
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amazon Logistics, Inc.
Represented By: John Charles Stiglich, II
Represented By: John T. Eads, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amazon.Com Services, Inc. doing business as Amazon Fulfillment Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Out 4 Delivery, LLC
Represented By: Philip E. Kalamaros
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amazon.Com Services, Inc. a Registered Michigan Foreign Corporation doing business as Amazon Fulfillment Services, Inc.
Represented By: John Charles Stiglich, II
Represented By: John T. Eads, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacquelyn Worstell
Represented By: James Marco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?