Goodwin v. Kent County District Attorney et al
Petitioner: Keith A. Goodwin
Respondent: Judge Paul L. Maloney, Kent County District Attorney and Paul L. Maloney
Case Number: 1:2020cv00725
Filed: August 4, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Sally J Berens
Referring Judge: Hala Y Jarbou
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1442
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 30, 2020 Copy of Notice Regarding Reassignment (HYJ), #11 ; Report and Recommendation, #12 sent via U.S. Mail to Keith A. Goodwin (jmw) Modified text on 9/30/2020 (jmw).
September 29, 2020 Filing 12 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION that Defendant's motion to dismiss #7 be granted and that the case against the remaining defendant be remanded to state court; objections to R&R due within 14 days; signed by Magistrate Judge Sally J. Berens (cbh)
September 28, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE that this case is reassigned to District Judge Hala Y. Jarbou under #Administrative Order No. 20-CA-071 ; Judge Janet T. Neff is no longer assigned to the case (asm)
September 10, 2020 Filing 10 REPLY to response to motion #7 to dismiss filed by Paul L. Maloney (Toomey, Zak)
August 31, 2020 Filing 9 RESPONSE TO MOTION to dismiss #7 filed by Keith A. Goodwin (ns)
August 14, 2020 Filing 8 STATE COURT DOCUMENT (Register of Actions) received from the 17th Circuit Court (ns)
August 11, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION to dismiss by respondent Paul L. Maloney; (Toomey, Zak)
August 11, 2020 Copy of Order on Request for Pre-Motion Conference #6 sent via U.S. Mail to Keith A. Goodwin (ns)
August 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER dismissing as moot #4 request for pre-motion conference; Respondent may file a dispositive motion; signed by Magistrate Judge Sally J. Berens (jal)
August 10, 2020 Copy of Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge #5 sent via U.S. Mail to Keith A. Goodwin (ns)
August 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Sally J. Berens; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, rmw)
August 6, 2020 Filing 4 REQUEST for pre-motion conference by respondent Paul L. Maloney (Toomey, Zak)
August 6, 2020 Copy of Notice Regarding Assignment of Case #3 sent via U.S. Mail to Keith A. Goodwin (ns)
August 6, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE that this case has been assigned Janet T. Neff (ns)
August 5, 2020 Filing 2 Memorandum regarding potentially related case returned to Clerk from Magistrate Judge Berens indicating that this case is not related (tlbu)
August 4, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 17th Circuit Court case number 20-04250-CZ filed by Paul L. Maloney (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Complaint) (Toomey, Zak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Goodwin v. Kent County District Attorney et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Judge Paul L. Maloney
Represented By: Zak Toomey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Kent County District Attorney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Paul L. Maloney
Represented By: Zak Toomey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Keith A. Goodwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?