Flynn v. Accredited Management Solutions LLC et al
Plaintiff: Jacob Flynn
Defendant: United Merchant Asset Recovery of WNY, LLC, Alexis D. Hennebohl, O'Brien Wexler And Associates LLC, Chantelle Nicole McClain, Thomas Eugene Clare, Darrin L. Snell, Jamie L. Letcher, Anthony K. Clayton, Accredited Management Solutions LLC, Dana D. Scott, Jeremy D. Brown, Jon Daniel Wiley, Thomas Letcher, United Merchant Asset Recovery, LLC, International Recovery Partners & Associates, LLC, Jeremy J. Zimmerman, Charles Joseph Johnson, Jr., Sean M. Millard, Mahogony Allen, Heston F. McClain, Eric C. Williams, Sr., Amanda Marie Yousett, Derrick J. Starks, Nicole R. Drzyzga, Emily J. Harvey, JDB Holdings LLC, Copeland Klein & Associates LLC, Donald Deboe, Michael David Enzinna and Michelle J. Hoover
Case Number: 1:2020cv00760
Filed: August 14, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Phillip J Green
Referring Judge: Robert J Jonker
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 24, 2020 Filing 16 DEFAULT ENTERED as to defendants Heston F. McClain, United Merchant Asset Recovery, LLC (ns)
September 24, 2020 Filing 15 APPLICATION for entry of default as to Heston F. McClain and United Merchant Asset Recovery, LLC (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Phillip C. Rogers) (Rogers, Phillip)
September 22, 2020 Filing 14 SUMMONS returned executed; Accredited Management Solutions LLC served on 9/21/2020, answer due 10/13/2020; Jeremy D. Brown served on 9/21/2020, answer due 10/13/2020; JDB Holdings LLC served on 9/21/2020, answer due 10/13/2020 (Rogers, Phillip)
September 18, 2020 Filing 13 SUMMONS returned executed; Accredited Management Solutions LLC served on 9/18/2020, answer due 10/9/2020; Jeremy D. Brown served on 9/18/2020, answer due 10/9/2020; JDB Holdings LLC served on 9/18/2020, answer due 10/9/2020 (Rogers, Phillip)
September 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #7 motion for alternate service; signed by Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker (Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker, sdb)
September 17, 2020 Filing 11 DEFAULT ENTERED as to defendants Mahogony Allen, Anthony K. Clayton, Donald Deboe, Nicole R. Drzyzga, Alexis D. Hennebohl, Michelle J. Hoover, Charles Joseph Johnson, Jr, Sean M. Millard, Dana D. Scott, Darrin L. Snell, Jon Daniel Wiley, Amanda Marie Yousett (ns)
September 16, 2020 Filing 10 APPLICATION for entry of default as to Sean M. Millard, Dana D. Scott, Mahogony Allen, Anthony K. Clayton, Donald DeBoe, Nicole R. Drzyzga, Alexis D. Hennebohl, Michelle J. Hoover, Charles Joseph Johnson Jr., Darrin L. Snell, Jon Daniel Wiley and Amanda Marie Yousett (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Phillip C. Rogers, #2 Proposed Document Entry of Default) (Rogers, Phillip)
September 10, 2020 Filing 9 SUMMONS returned executed; Mahogony Allen served on 8/22/2020, answer due 9/14/2020; Anthony K. Clayton served on 8/22/2020, answer due 9/14/2020; Donald Deboe served on 8/22/2020, answer due 9/14/2020; Nicole R. Drzyzga served on 8/22/2020, answer due 9/14/2020; Alexis D. Hennebohl served on 8/22/2020, answer due 9/14/2020; Michelle J. Hoover served on 8/22/2020, answer due 9/14/2020; Charles Joseph Johnson, Jr served on 8/22/2020, answer due 9/14/2020; Darrin L. Snell served on 8/22/2020, answer due 9/14/2020; Jon Daniel Wiley served on 8/22/2020, answer due 9/14/2020; Amanda Marie Yousett served on 8/25/2020, answer due 9/15/2020 (Rogers, Phillip)
September 10, 2020 Filing 8 BRIEF in support of MOTION for alternate service as to defendants Accredited Management Solutions LLC, JDB Holdings LLC, and Jeremy D. Brown #7 filed by Jacob Flynn (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C) (Rogers, Phillip)
September 10, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for alternate service as to defendants Accredited Management Solutions LLC, JDB Holdings LLC, and Jeremy D. Brown by plaintiff Jacob Flynn; (Rogers, Phillip)
September 8, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS returned executed; Heston F. McClain served on 9/1/2020, answer due 9/22/2020; United Merchant Asset Recovery, LLC served on 9/1/2020, answer due 9/22/2020 (Rogers, Phillip)
August 26, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS returned executed; Sean M. Millard served on 8/22/2020, answer due 9/14/2020; Dana D. Scott served on 8/22/2020, answer due 9/14/2020 (Rogers, Phillip)
August 17, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to defendants Accredited Management Solutions LLC, Mahogony Allen, Jeremy D. Brown, Thomas Eugene Clare, Anthony K. Clayton, Copeland Klein & Associates LLC, Donald Deboe, Nicole R. Drzyzga, Michael David Enzinna, Emily J. Harvey, Alexis D. Hennebohl, Michelle J. Hoover, International Recovery Partners & Associates, LLC, JDB Holdings LLC, Charles Joseph Johnson, Jr, Jamie L. Letcher, Thomas Letcher, Chantelle Nicole McClain, Heston F. McClain, Sean M. Millard, O'Brien Wexler And Associates LLC, Dana D. Scott, Darrin L. Snell, Derrick J. Starks, United Merchant Asset Recovery of WNY, LLC, United Merchant Asset Recovery, LLC, Jon Daniel Wiley, Eric C. Williams, Sr, Amanda Marie Yousett, Jeremy J. Zimmerman (ns)
August 17, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE that this case has been assigned Robert J. Jonker (ns)
August 14, 2020 FILING FEE PAID re #1 by plaintiff Jacob Flynn in the amount of $400, receipt number AMIWDC-5574589 (Rogers, Phillip)
August 14, 2020 Filing 2 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued re #1 (Rogers, Phillip)
August 14, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Jacob Flynn (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Rogers, Phillip)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Flynn v. Accredited Management Solutions LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Merchant Asset Recovery of WNY, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alexis D. Hennebohl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: O'Brien Wexler And Associates LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chantelle Nicole McClain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Eugene Clare
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Darrin L. Snell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jamie L. Letcher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony K. Clayton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Accredited Management Solutions LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dana D. Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeremy D. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jon Daniel Wiley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Letcher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Merchant Asset Recovery, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: International Recovery Partners & Associates, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeremy J. Zimmerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles Joseph Johnson, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sean M. Millard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mahogony Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Heston F. McClain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric C. Williams, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amanda Marie Yousett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Derrick J. Starks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nicole R. Drzyzga
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Emily J. Harvey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JDB Holdings LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Copeland Klein & Associates LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald Deboe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael David Enzinna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michelle J. Hoover
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacob Flynn
Represented By: Phillip C. Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?