Newberne v. Intel Advantage, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Donald Newberne
Defendant: Chauncey Henri Thompson, Intel Logistics, LLC, Branch Capital Investments LLC, Anthony Carlos Allen, II, Darren Leon Abrams, Jr., Lakeland Capital, LLC, Advance Intel Services LLC, Intel Advantage, LLC, Patrice Nicole Branch and Intel Advantage II, Limited
Case Number: 1:2020cv00783
Filed: August 20, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Sally J Berens
Referring Judge: Hala Y Jarbou
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2020 Filing 15 APPLICATION for entry of default as to Advance Intel Services LLC and Chauncey Henri Thompson (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Phillip C. Rogers) (Rogers, Phillip)
October 1, 2020 Filing 14 BRIEF in support of MOTION for alternate service as to defendants Darren Leon Abrams Jr. and Intel Logistics, LLC #13 filed by Donald Newberne (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (Rogers, Phillip)
October 1, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION for alternate service as to defendants Darren Leon Abrams Jr. and Intel Logistics, LLC by plaintiff Donald Newberne; (Rogers, Phillip)
September 30, 2020 Filing 12 BRIEF in support of MOTION for alternate service #11 filed by Donald Newberne (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Jonathan Caldwell) (Rogers, Phillip)
September 30, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION for alternate service by plaintiff Donald Newberne; (Rogers, Phillip)
September 28, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE that this case is reassigned to District Judge Hala Y. Jarbou under #Administrative Order No. 20-CA-071 ; Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker is no longer assigned to the case (krv)
September 24, 2020 Filing 9 SUMMONS returned executed; Advance Intel Services LLC served on 9/19/2020, answer due 10/13/2020 (Rogers, Phillip)
September 24, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS returned executed; Chauncey Henri Thompson served on 9/19/2020, answer due 10/13/2020 (Rogers, Phillip)
August 31, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE that the magistrate judge in this case is reassigned back to Magistrate Judge Sally J. Berens for all further proceedings; Magistrate Judge Ray Kent no longer assigned to case (jlg)
August 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE that this case is reassigned to Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker and Magistrate Judge Ray Kent for all further proceedings pursuant to Order 5 by Judge Maloney; Judge Paul L. Maloney and Magistrate Judge Sally J. Berens no longer assigned to case (pjw)
August 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER OF RECUSAL: District Judge Paul L. Maloney recused from this case; case to be reassigned; signed by District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Judge Paul L. Maloney, acr)
August 21, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to defendants Darren Leon Abrams, Jr, Advance Intel Services LLC, Anthony Carlos Allen, II, Patrice Nicole Branch, Branch Capital Investments LLC, Intel Advantage II, Limited, Intel Advantage, LLC, Intel Logistics, LLC, Lakeland Capital, LLC, Chauncey Henri Thompson (pjw)
August 21, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE that this case has been assigned Paul L. Maloney (pjw)
August 20, 2020 FILING FEE PAID re #1 by plaintiff Donald Newberne in the amount of $400, receipt number AMIWDC-5595721 (Rogers, Phillip)
August 20, 2020 Filing 2 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued re #1 (Rogers, Phillip)
August 20, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Donald Newberne (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Rogers, Phillip)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Newberne v. Intel Advantage, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chauncey Henri Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Intel Logistics, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Branch Capital Investments LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony Carlos Allen, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Darren Leon Abrams, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lakeland Capital, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Advance Intel Services LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Intel Advantage, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patrice Nicole Branch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Intel Advantage II, Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald Newberne
Represented By: Phillip C. Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?